Generation Brands LLC et al v. Decor Selections, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Visual Comfort of America, LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC and Generation Brands LLC
Defendant: Larry Krayzman, Decor Selections, LLC, Lighting Commerc, LLC and Lighting Commerce, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06185
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS Report by Generation Brands LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Visual Comfort of America, LLC (Groza, Jon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Defendants' partial motion #27 to dismiss Counts Two and Three, and all counts against the individual Defendant, Plaintiffs' response is due by 12/05/2019. Defendants' reply is due by 12/19/2019. The initial status hearing of 11/22/2020 remains in place. Emailed notice (slb, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Decor Selections, LLC, Larry Krayzman, Lighting Commerce, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #27 (Holt, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Holt for presentment of motion to dismiss #27 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Holt, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendants Lighting Commerce, LLC, Larry Krayzman, Decor Selections, LLC to dismiss (Holt, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Applications by Gene W. Lee, Jacob P. Dini and John H. Gray to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants are granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Holt for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #24 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Holt, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16363668. (Holt, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Holt for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #22 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Holt, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16363637. (Holt, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Holt for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #20 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Holt, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16363490. (Holt, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendant's agreed extension motion #13 to answer is granted to 11/12/2019. Status hearing of 10/31/2019 is reset to 11/22/2019 at 10 a.m., with the joint initial status report due by 11/14/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Applications by Jon W. Groza and Sean P. Malone to appear pro hac vice [13 and 14] are granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Julianne Marie Hartzell for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #15 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/10/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Hartzell, Julianne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Julianne Marie Hartzell for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #14 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/10/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Hartzell, Julianne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16306905. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean P. Malone)(Hartzell, Julianne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16306854. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jon W. Groza)(Hartzell, Julianne)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Decor Selections, LLC, Larry Krayzman, Lighting Commerce, LLC for extension of time to file response/reply AGREED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND (Holt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visual Comfort of America, LLC, Generation Brands LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC as to Lighting Commerce, LLC on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Hartzell, Julianne) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/4/2019 (lma, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visual Comfort of America, LLC, Generation Brands LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC as to Decor Selections, LLC on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Hartzell, Julianne) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/4/2019 (lma, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visual Comfort of America, LLC, Generation Brands LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC as to Larry Krayzman on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Hartzell, Julianne) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/4/2019 (lma, ).
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Decor Selections, LLC, Larry Krayzman, Lighting Commerc, LLC by Thomas Lee Holt (Holt, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Decor Selections, LLC, Larry Krayzman, Lighting Commerc, LLC. (td, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 9:15 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
September 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Hartzell, Julianne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hartzell, Julianne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Generation Brands LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Visual Comfort of America, LLC by Julianne Marie Hartzell (Hartzell, Julianne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Visual Comfort of America, LLC, Generation Brands LLC, Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC, Murray Feiss Import LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16241090. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Visual Comfort Screen shot, #3 Exhibit C - Feiss Screenshot, #4 Exhibit D - Seagull Screenshot, #5 Exhibit E - Monte Carlo Screenshot)(Hartzell, Julianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Generation Brands LLC et al v. Decor Selections, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Krayzman
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Jacob P. Dini
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: John H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decor Selections, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Jacob P. Dini
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: John H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Commerc, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Commerce, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Jacob P. Dini
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: John H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Gull Lighting Products, LLC
Represented By: Julianne Marie Hartzell
Represented By: Sean Patric Malone
Represented By: Jonathon William Groza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visual Comfort of America, LLC
Represented By: Julianne Marie Hartzell
Represented By: Sean Patric Malone
Represented By: Jonathon William Groza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Feiss Import LLC
Represented By: Julianne Marie Hartzell
Represented By: Sean Patric Malone
Represented By: Jonathon William Groza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generation Brands LLC
Represented By: Julianne Marie Hartzell
Represented By: Sean Patric Malone
Represented By: Jonathon William Groza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?