LTC Partners, LLC et al v. Wilkey et al
Plaintiff: LTC Partners, LLC and Joel Dryer
Defendant: Duane Wilkey, ADW Partners, LLC and Aaron Wilkey
Case Number: 1:2019cv06190
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' second motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #12 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings due 12/6/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 11/13/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph G Pia for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Pia, Joseph)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants ADW Partners, LLC, Aaron Wilkey, Duane Wilkey for extension of time to file answer regarding order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, order on motion to appear pro hac vice,, terminate deadlines,, terminate hearings, #8 Second Motion for Extension of Time (Pia, Joseph)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LTC Partners, LLC, Joel Dryer as to ADW Partners, LLC on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Schaller, Rachel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LTC Partners, LLC, Joel Dryer as to Aaron Wilkey on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Schaller, Rachel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LTC Partners, LLC, Joel Dryer as to Duane Wilkey on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Schaller, Rachel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #5 and attorney Joseph Pia's Motion to appear pro hac vice #7 are granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings due by 11/7/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 10/22/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16339997. (Pia, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' NOTICE of Motion by Joseph G Pia for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/22/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Pia, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants Aaron Wilkey, Duane Wilkey for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 Unopposed (Pia, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Aaron Wilkey, Duane Wilkey. (lw, )
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ADW Partners, LLC (ecw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joel Dryer, LTC Partners, LLC by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schaller, Rachel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Joel Dryer, LTC Partners, LLC Exhibits 1-12 regarding complaint #1 (Schaller, Rachel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by LTC Partners, LLC, Joel Dryer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16241986.(Schaller, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LTC Partners, LLC et al v. Wilkey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTC Partners, LLC
Represented By: Rachel L Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Dryer
Represented By: Rachel L Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Wilkey
Represented By: Joseph G Pia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADW Partners, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Pia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Wilkey
Represented By: Joseph G Pia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?