Calvin Klein Trademark Trust et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Calvin Klein Trademark Trust and Calvin Klein, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv06215
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 12/11/19 at 9:00a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 39 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/23/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 10/23/19. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 is granted. The clerk is directed to unseal the entire case. Enter order.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 31 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/10/2019. Mailed notice (mc, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 32 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/9/2019. Mailed notice(mc, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 BOND in the amount of $10,000 posted by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. (Document not scanned) (las, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant XIE JI PING and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (acm, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/25/2019. (rp, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/25/2019. (rp, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 , motion for miscellaneous relief #18 , motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. Exhibit 6 regarding declaration #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. Exhibit 5 - Parts 1-6 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-1, #2 Exhibit 5-2, #3 Exhibit 5-3, #4 Exhibit 5-4, #5 Exhibit 5-5, #6 Exhibit 5-6)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Dawn Buonocore-Atlas regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (smm, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Trademark Information). (smm, )
September 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Charles, Analeah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16247859. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin Klein Trademark Trust et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Klein Trademark Trust
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Martin Francis Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Klein, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Martin Francis Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?