ISLA Development LLC et al v. Hovde et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Riegel, JJBA Holdings, LLC and ISLA Development LLC
Defendant: Steven D Hovde and Eric D Hovde
Case Number: 1:2019cv06258
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Minute order #24 is corrected: For the reasons stated on the record and by agreement of the parties, the Court vacates its order consolidating Case Number 18-cv-7323 and Case Number 19-cv-6258. Those cases should still be designated as related to one another. The Clerk is directed to reopen Case Number 19-cv-6258. Upon reopening that case, the Clerk is further directed to remove docket entries 69 and 71 from Case Number 18-cv-7323. The Clerk will then add those entries to the docket for Case Number 19-cv-6258.Mailed notice (ca, ) Modified on 10/31/2019 (ca, ).
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:For the reasons stated on the record and by agreement of the parties, the Court vacates its order consolidating Case Number 18-cv-7323 and Case Number 19-cv-6259. Those cases should still be designated as related to one another. The Clerk is directed to reopen Case Number 19-cv-6259. Upon reopening that case, the Clerk is further directed to remove docket entries 69 and 71 from Case Number 18-cv-7323. The Clerk will then add those entries to the docket for Case Number 19-cv-6259. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Evidentiary hearing held on 10/30/19. The motion for preliminary injunction is taken under advisement. Status hearing set for 1/9/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM of Law in opposition to Preliminary Injunction by Eric D Hovde, Steven D Hovde. (ph, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 26 STATUS Report by Eric D Hovde, Steven D Hovde. (ph, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The Court granted the motion to consolidate 58 Hovde v. ISLA Development LLC, 18C7323, and ISLA Development LLC v. Hovde, 19C6258, on October 2, 2019. Accordingly, the Court terminates this case. All future filings shall be made in Hovde v. ISLA Development LLC, 18C7323.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/3/2019.(rp, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 9/26/2019. Motion to dissolve #14 is denied for reasons stated in open court. Status hearing is set for 10/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Hearing on preliminary injunction is set for 10/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry #12 is corrected to reflect motion to dismiss #10 is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegelin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Eric D Hovde, Steven D Hovde to vacate temporary restraining order #13 #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Riegel Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshot)(Jordan, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey T. Riegel regarding motion for temporary restraining order,,, motion for preliminary injunction,,, motion for permanent injunction,, #2 (Jordan, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Edward P. Freud, First for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Freud, Edward)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Eric D Hovde, Steven D Hovde to vacate temporary restraining order #13 (Freud, Edward)
September 23, 2019 CHECK BOND in the amount of $ $1,000.00, Receipt#4624230502 posted by Jordan and Zito LLC for ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel (yt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/20/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Temporary restraining order hearing held on 9/20/2019. Motion for TRO #2 is granted; Order to follow. Bond set at $1,000.00. Plaintiff is authorized to post bond in the form of a check. Status hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to complaint, #1 Corrected Ex 1 (Jordan, Gregory)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Steven D Hovde, Eric D Hovde to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP19(a)(1)(A) (Freud, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Emergency motion hearing held on 9/20/2019. Motion for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction #2 continued to 1:30 p.m. Courtesy copies of motion to be provided to the Court by 10:30 a.m. this morning. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Eric D Hovde, Steven D Hovde by Edward P. Freud, First (Freud, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to complaint, #1 Exhibit 5 with English Translation (Jordan, Gregory)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to motion for temporary restraining order,,, motion for preliminary injunction,,, motion for permanent injunction,, #2 Exhibit 9 with English Translation (Jordan, Gregory)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory James Jordan for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order,,, motion for preliminary injunction,,, motion for permanent injunction,, #2 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Jordan, Gregory)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zito, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel by Gregory James Jordan (Jordan, Gregory)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiffs ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel for temporary restraining order , MOTION by Plaintiffs ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel for preliminary injunction , MOTION by Plaintiffs ISLA Development LLC, JJBA Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel for permanent injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Zito, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by ISLA Development LLC, Jeffrey T Riegel, JJBA Holdings, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16253365. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Zito, Mark)
September 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David M. Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISLA Development LLC et al v. Hovde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Riegel
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Represented By: Mark R. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJBA Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Represented By: Mark R. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISLA Development LLC
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Represented By: Mark R. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Hovde
Represented By: Edward P. Freud, First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric D Hovde
Represented By: Edward P. Freud, First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?