Grane Logistics Express, Inc. v. International Logistics Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grane Logistics Express, Inc.
Defendant: International Logistics Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06289
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY by International Logistics Group, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. to dismiss Count I and Count III of First Amended Complaint #22 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count I and Count III of First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolf, Thomas)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Grane Logistics Express, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. to dismiss Count I and Count III of First Amended Complaint #22 (Koch, Matthew)
March 4, 2020 Filing 25 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Grane Logistics Express, Inc. Exhibits regarding amended complaint #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit to Amended Complaint)(Koch, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant ILG International Logistics Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count I and Count III of First Amended Complaint #22 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 3/4/2020. Defendant to reply by 3/18/2020. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/22/2020 at 9:45 a.m. No appearance required on 2/12/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas M. Wolf for presentment of motion to dismiss #22 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/12/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Wolf, Thomas)
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. to dismiss Count I and Count III of First Amended Complaint (Wolf, Thomas)
January 20, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED complaint by Grane Logistics Express, Inc. against International Logistics Group, Inc. (Koch, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 1/16/2020. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. However, plaintiff's motion to file its attached proposed amended complaint is granted. Discovery will close on 6/1/2020. Status hearing set for 6/15/2020 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Grane Logistics Express, Inc. for reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Koch, Matthew)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by International Logistics Group, Inc.(Wolf, Thomas)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/20/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint #8 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint #8 set for 12/19/2019 is stricken. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo is reset to 12/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 12/16/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wolf, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Grane Logistics Express, Inc. to motion to dismiss #8 (Koch, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grane Logistics Express, Inc. by Matthew Carl Koch (Koch, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint #8 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 10/28/2019. Defendant to reply by 11/11/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/16/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 10/7/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas M. Wolf for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Wolf, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. to dismiss Count I of Complaint (Wolf, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to F.R.C.P 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 by International Logistics Group, Inc. (Wolf, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
September 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. by Scott C. Bentivenga (Bentivenga, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Logistics Group, Inc. by Thomas M. Wolf (Wolf, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolf, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from DuPage County, case number (2019L000846) filed by Internal Logistics Group, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16257877. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wolf, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grane Logistics Express, Inc. v. International Logistics Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grane Logistics Express, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Carl Koch
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Logistics Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Wolf
Represented By: Scott C. Bentivenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?