MNG 2005, INC. v. Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, INC.
Defendant: Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC, General Parking Corporation and 4 Garages, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06308
Filed: September 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants General Parking Corporation, 4 Garages, LLC, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Mortge, Barry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED complaint by MNG 2005, INC. against 4 Garages, LLC, General Parking Corporation, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC (Cohen, Nathan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The complaint in this case, which was filed in federal court based on purported diversity of citizenship, does not adequately describe the citizenship of each defendant. The complaint alleges that the sole member of defendant Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC is another LLC called 4 Garages, LLC, which is also a named defendant. The complaint, however, does not adequately describe the citizenship of 4 Garages, LLC. Plaintiff is directed to file within 10 days of the date of this order an amended complaint setting forth the citizenship of the members of each defendant, including the complete citizenship of any corporate or LLC members. See Mutual Assignment & Indemnification Co. v. Lind-Waldock & Co., LLC, 364 F.3d 858, 861 (7th Cir. 2004); Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729, 731 (7th Cir. 1998). There is a decent likelihood that the plaintiff does not have access to the necessary information, and if that is the case, the Court directs the defendants to cooperate and provide the necessary information to the plaintiff. The 11/7/2019 motion hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is vacated, and the motion is continued to the initial status hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 9:00 AM. (mk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 11/22/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Barry I. Mortge for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mortge, Barry)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants General Parking Corporation, 4 Garages, LLC, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC , MOTION by Defendants General Parking Corporation, 4 Garages, LLC, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Mortge, Barry)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 4 Garages, LLC, General Parking Corporation, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC by Barry I. Mortge and Becker Gurian (Mortge, Barry)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MNG 2005, INC.. All Defendants. (Cohen, Nathan)
September 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 4 Garages, LLC, General Parking Corporation, Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC. (lw, )
September 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cohen, Nathan)
September 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MNG 2005, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16260359.(Cohen, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MNG 2005, INC. v. Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabash Randolph Garage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Garages, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?