Cordova v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Emelida Cordova
Defendant: City of Chicago
Intervenor: United States
Case Number: 1:2019cv06321
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 WITHDRAWING David Paul Holtkamp as counsel for Defendant City of Chicago and substituting Charles A. King as counsel of record (King, Charles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Defendant City of Chicago to motion to withdraw reference #1 (Holtkamp, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor United States by Andrea Horowitz Handel (Horowitz Handel, Andrea)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court strikes the motion hearing set for 10/8/19 and orders a reply brief by the City due on or before 10/14/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Emelida Cordova to set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings #8 (Briggs, Ross)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emelida Cordova by Ross Harry Briggs (Briggs, Ross)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Any response to the Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference should be filed by 10/1/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE of Motion by David Paul Holtkamp for presentment of motion to withdraw reference #1 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Holtkamp, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Rule 83.16 Letter to Counsel of Record. (gcy, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/24/19.(gcy, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to motion to withdraw reference #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Ross, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Motion by David Paul Holtkamp for presentment of motion to withdraw reference #1 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Holtkamp, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by David Paul Holtkamp (Holtkamp, David)
September 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordova v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: David Paul Holtkamp
Represented By: Charles A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emelida Cordova
Represented By: Ross Harry Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States
Represented By: Andrea Horowitz Handel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?