Lymon v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Allen Lymon
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv06394
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 MAILED in forma pauperis application along with a copy of order #3 dated 10/25/2019 to Allen Lymon. (pj, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff is given until November 27, 2019 to either to file an in forma pauperis application on the enclosed form or to pay the full $47.00 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application along with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff does not comply with this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/25/2019. Mailed notice (pj, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED MOTION for return of property Pursuant to Fed.R.Crim.P. 41(g) and No copies by Allen Lymon; (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmark 9/10/19; institution mail room 9/10/19). (Temporarily unavailable for docketing).(smm, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (Temporarily unavailable for docketing). (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lymon v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Lymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Bolling W Haxall
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?