Illinois Department of Revenue v. Total Finance Investment Inc. et al
Appellant: Illinois Department of Revenue
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Total Finance Investment Inc., Full Service Auto Repair AC LLC, Todo Seguro Premium Finance AC LLC, Car Outlet Holding, Inc., Todo Seguro AC LLC, Car Outlet AC LLC and Total Finance AC LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06427
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 3/7/19 and 7/18/19 regarding Notice of Appeal #11 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Rivera, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Motion for an Order Setting Briefing Schedule #12 is granted. Appellant's opening brief: December 16, 2019Appellees' brief: February 7, 2020Appellant's reply brief: February 28, 2020The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, Npovember 15, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by James Douglas Newbold for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Motion)(Newbold, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Illinois Department of Revenue by James Douglas Newbold (Newbold, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Appellant Illinois Department of Revenue for extension of time (Motion to set briefing schedule and for application of Bankruptcy Rule 8015) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion)(Newbold, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, ) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/28/2019 (pk, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16314940. (Amy, Nogid)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellees Car Outlet AC LLC, Car Outlet Holding, Inc., Full Service Auto Repair AC LLC, Todo Seguro AC LLC, Todo Seguro Premium Finance AC LLC, Total Finance AC LLC, Total Finance Investment Inc. by Samantha Clark Booth (Booth, Samantha)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellees Car Outlet AC LLC, Car Outlet Holding, Inc., Full Service Auto Repair AC LLC, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Todo Seguro AC LLC, Todo Seguro Premium Finance AC LLC, Total Finance AC LLC, Total Finance Investment Inc. by Craig E. Reimer (Reimer, Craig)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellees Total Finance Investment Inc., Car Outlet Holding, Inc., Car Outlet AC LLC, Full Service Auto Repair AC LLC, Todo Seguro AC LLC, Todo Seguro Premium Finance AC LLC, Total Finance AC LLC by Joshua D Yount (Yount, Joshua)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Total Finance Investment Inc. by Jackson Taylor Garvey (Garvey, Jackson)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Total Finance Investment Inc. by William A Evanoff (Evanoff, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Total Finance Investment Inc. by Bojan Guzina (Guzina, Bojan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 letter)(nsf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Illinois Department of Revenue by Robert Owen Lynch, III (Lynch, Robert)
September 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 B 3734 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Department of Revenue v. Total Finance Investment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Illinois Department of Revenue
Represented By: Robert Owen Lynch, III
Represented By: James Douglas Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Total Finance Investment Inc.
Represented By: Amy F. Nogid
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: William A Evanoff
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Bojan Guzina
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Represented By: Jackson Taylor Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Full Service Auto Repair AC LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Todo Seguro Premium Finance AC LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Car Outlet Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Todo Seguro AC LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Car Outlet AC LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Total Finance AC LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Samantha Clark Booth
Represented By: Craig E. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?