RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC v. 400 Townline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC
Defendant: 600 Rand Rd, LLC, Adi Mor and 400 Townline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06448
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Status hearing held. Settlement conference is set for 12/12/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Parties are to review and to comply with this Court's Standing Order on Settlement Conference which is available through the Court's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff's counsel to submit a written itemization of damages and settlement demand to defendants' counsel with a brief explanation of why such a settlement is appropriate on or before 11/14/2019. An electronic copy of this submission must also be sent to the Court's proposed order box at the same time, Proposed_Order_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Defendants' counsel to submit a written offer to plaintiff's counsel and the Court's proposed order box with a brief explanation of why such a settlement is appropriate on or before 12/3/2019. The date is firm and can only be changed by the granting of a motion. Parties have agreed to allow the Court to conduct ex parte discussions if necessary in preparation of the conference. Mailed notice (np, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 11/6/2019. In light of the status before Magistrate Judge Cox, plaintiff's motion to dismiss borrower's complaint #24 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM to stand. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Demetria Hamilton for presentment of motion to dismiss #24 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/6/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Hamilton, Demetria)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC to dismiss Borrowers' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This matter has been referred to Judge Cox to conduct a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 09:45 AM. for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference. Counsel that appears for this pre-settlement conference discussion must be counsel who will represent their respective clients at the conference, or are able to discuss the issues of the case and to schedule the conference on behalf of their clients. The Court expects counsel to discuss issues in the case that may affect the settlement process. Mailed notice (np, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Susan E. Cox pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/25/2019.(nsf, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/25/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 10/28/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM. Enter Stipulation and Order. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 10/23/2019. Plaintiff's joint motion to consolidate cases #17 is granted. Case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for settlement. Plaintiff's motion to appoint receiver #8 is entered and continued. Status hearing is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Jon DeJonker for presentment of motion to consolidate cases, motion to reassign case #17 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/29/2019 at 08:45 AM. (DeJonker, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC to consolidate cases , MOTION by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC to reassign case / JOINT MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeJonker, Jason)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on 400 Townline, LLC, c/o Shari Gamer, Reg Agent on 10/4/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on 600 Rand Rd., LLC, c/o Shari Gamer, Reg. Agent on 10/4/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Adi Mor on 10/7/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/10/2019. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of receiver #8 is entered and continued. Status hearing is set for 10/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 400 Townline, LLC, 600 Rand Rd, LLC, Adi Mor by Mark Edward Wilson (Wilson, Mark)
September 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 400 Townline, LLC, 600 Rand Rd, LLC, Adi Mor (mc, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC (DeJonker, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC (DeJonker, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Jon DeJonker for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/10/2019 at 08:45 AM. (DeJonker, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC to appoint receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A through D)(DeJonker, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
September 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC by Aaron E. Davis (Davis, Aaron)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC by Demetria Hamilton (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC re complaint #1 (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC by Jason Jon DeJonker (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16283929. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-22)(DeJonker, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC v. 400 Townline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 600 Rand Rd, LLC
Represented By: Mark Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adi Mor
Represented By: Mark Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 400 Townline, LLC
Represented By: Mark Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSS UBSCM 2017-C4-IL FDGFM, LLC
Represented By: Demetria Hamilton
Represented By: Aaron E. Davis
Represented By: Jason Jon DeJonker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?