Securities and Exchange Commission v. SBB Research Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Samuel B. Barnett, SBB Research Group, LLC and Matthew Lawrence Aven
Case Number: 1:2019cv06473
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Securities and Exchange Commission (Leiman, Timothy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16479148. (Droz, Alexandra)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16479092. (Baker, Howard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court grants defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time and page limit #14 . Defendants must file their responsive pleading by 12/9/2019. The memorandum in support of the motion may be up to 25 pages. Plaintiff is also allowed 25 pages for its brief in opposition, although the Court encourages both parties to express their arguments as succinctly as possible. Defendants' motion #12 is stricken as moot. No appearance is necessary on 11/19/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Matthew Lawrence Aven, Samuel B. Barnett, SBB Research Group, LLC to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Matthew Lawrence Aven, Samuel B. Barnett, SBB Research Group, LLC for extension of time #12 (Rosenburg, Howard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Rosenburg for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/19/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Rosenburg, Howard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Matthew Lawrence Aven, Samuel B. Barnett, SBB Research Group, LLC for extension of time (Rosenburg, Howard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Matthew Lawrence Aven waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Samuel B. Barnett waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. SBB Research Group, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by Kevin A. Wisniewski (Wisniewski, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 12/2/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Matthew Lawrence Aven, Samuel B. Barnett, SBB Research Group, LLC by Howard J. Rosenburg (Rosenburg, Howard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by Robert MacDonald Moye (Moye, Robert)
September 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by Timothy Stewart Leiman (Leiman, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leiman, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; Jury Demand. (Leiman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. SBB Research Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel B. Barnett
Represented By: Howard J. Rosenburg
Represented By: Howard Gregory Baker
Represented By: Alexandra Droz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBB Research Group, LLC
Represented By: Howard J. Rosenburg
Represented By: Howard Gregory Baker
Represented By: Alexandra Droz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lawrence Aven
Represented By: Howard J. Rosenburg
Represented By: Howard Gregory Baker
Represented By: Alexandra Droz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Robert MacDonald Moye
Represented By: Timothy Stewart Leiman
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kevin A. Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?