Conagra Brands, Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06504
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Kerry Mohan (Mohan, Kerry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Daniel J. Mohan (Mohan, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for reassignment and consolidation #19 is granted. The Court finds that Conagra Brands, Inc., f/k/a ConAgra Foods, Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al. (1:19-cv-06504), PCS Sales (USA), Inc., et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et. al. (1:19-cv-06505), Lafarge North America, Inc., et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et. al.. (1:19-cv-06506), and Old World Industries, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company, et. al. (1:19-cv-06507) are related within the meaning of Local Rule 40.4, that the three higher- numbered cases should be reassigned to this Court and consolidated for all pre-trial purposes with Conagra Brands, Inc., f/k/a ConAgra Foods, Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al. (1:19-cv-06504), and that each of the four cases shall be entitled to a separate jury trial in accordance with Rule 42(b). Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4(d), the Court will request that the Executive Committee reassign the three higher-number cases to this Court. Counsel are requested to keep the Court apprised of any pertinent developments before the JPML. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/19/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Conagra Brands, Inc. by Kaitlin Patricia Sheehan (Sheehan, Kaitlin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Sean Christopher Gingrich (Gingrich, Sean)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 Petition (NOT Motion) Notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of defendants' notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions, #2 Schedule of actions, #3 Exhibit A) (kp, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of motion to reassign case, #19 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/19/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Conagra Brands, Inc. to reassign case and consolidate for pre-trial purposes (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PCS Sales Complaint, #2 Exhibit Lafarge Complaint, #3 Exhibit Old World Industries Complaint)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 and #8 are granted. Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #16 is granted. Status hearing set for 11/14/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/7/2020 at 9:00 a.m. No appearances are necessary on 11/13/2019 or 11/14/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Conagra Brands, Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion for the Court to extend Defendants' deadline to the Complaint #13 is granted to 11/07/2019. Mailed notice (slb, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/31/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Conagra Brands, Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conagra Brands, Inc. as to Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/23/2019 (pk, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conagra Brands, Inc. as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Schapiro, Andrew)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/23/2019 (pk, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conagra Brands, Inc. as to CSX Transportation, Inc. on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/23/2019 (pk, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conagra Brands, Inc. as to BNSF Railway Company on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019.(Schapiro, Andrew)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/23/2019 (pk, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356511. (Rashid, Sami)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356420. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 11/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (lw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
October 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Conagra Brands, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Conagra Brands, Inc. by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16289525.(Schapiro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conagra Brands, Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Mohan
Represented By: Sean Christopher Gingrich
Represented By: Daniel J. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Kaitlin Patricia Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?