LaFarge North America, Inc. et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Systech Environmental Corporation, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Bardon, Inc. (dba Aggregate Industries Mid-Atlantic Region), Cement Transport, LTD, Kost, Inc., Holcim (US) Inc., Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Geocycle LLC, Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc. and Bardon, Inc.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06506
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Kerry Mohan (Mohan, Kerry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Sean Christopher Gingrich (Gingrich, Sean)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Daniel J. Mohan (Mohan, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/2019. (pj, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 Petition (NOT Motion) Notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of defendants' notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions, #2 Schedule of actions, #3 Exhibit A) (kp, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. of filing Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Conagra Case))(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The agreed extension motion #17 to file answer or response is granted to 12/16/2019. The status hearing of 11/22/2019 is reset to 01/08/2020 at 9:15 a.m., with the initial joint status report due on 01/03/2019. But the parties must take steps to consolidate the NDIL cases or bring the case within the MDL (or both, or definitively decide that neither step will be taken). Emailed notice (slb, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time,, #17 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/13/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The agreed extension motion #14 to respond to the complaint is granted as to all Defendants through 11/07/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time,, #14 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/31/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Union Pacific Railroad Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019; answer due 10/28/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/23/2019) (pj, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Norfolk Southern Railway Company c/o Corporation Service Company on 10/7/2019; answer due 10/28/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/23/2019) (pj, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on CSX Transportation, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019; answer due 10/28/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/23/2019) (pj, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on BNSF Railway Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019; answer due 10/28/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/23/2019) (pj, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Applications by Stephen Neuwirth and Sami Rashid to appear pro hac vice #7 #8 on behalf of Plaintiffs are granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356533. (Rashid, Sami)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356460. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (lw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
October 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Bardon, Inc. (dba Aggregate Industries Mid-Atlantic Region), Cement Transport, LTD, Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Geocycle LLC, Holcim (US) Inc., Kost, Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Redland Quarries NY Inc., Systech Environmental Corporation, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc. by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Geocycle LLC, Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc., Lattimore Materials Corp., Holcim (US) Inc., LaFarge North America, Inc., Meyer Material Company, LLC, Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc., Lafarge PNW, Inc., Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc., Aggregate Industries Management, Inc., Cement Transport, LTD, Systech Environmental Corporation, Kost, Inc., Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc., Bardon, Inc. (dba Aggregate Industries Mid-Atlantic Region), Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc., Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc., Redland Quarries NY Inc., Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16289563.(Schapiro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFarge North America, Inc. et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFarge North America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafarge PNW, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meyer Material Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Systech Environmental Corporation
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redland Quarries NY Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafarge Aggregates Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries - SWR, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredonia Valley Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bardon, Inc. (dba Aggregate Industries Mid-Atlantic Region)
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Transport, LTD
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kost, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holcim (US) Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries - MWR, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarrant Concrete, CO., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries Northeast Region, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lattimore Materials Corp.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geocycle LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bardon, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Mohan
Represented By: Sean Christopher Gingrich
Represented By: Daniel J. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?