Old World Industries, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Old World Industries, LLC
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06507
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Kerry Mohan (Mohan, Kerry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Sean Christopher Gingrich (Gingrich, Sean)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Daniel J. Mohan (Mohan, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/19. (kp, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 Petition (NOT Motion) Notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of defendants' notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions, #2 Schedule of actions, #3 Exhibit A) (kp, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Old World Industries, LLC of filing Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Conagra Case))(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties' stipulated motion for second extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #15 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 12/16/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 11/13/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties' stipulated motion for extension of time to file response to plaintiff's complaint #12 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 11/7/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 10/31/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/31/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Union Pacific Railroad Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Norfolk Southern Railway Company c/o Corporation Service Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on CSX Transportation, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on BNSF Railway Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorneys Stephen Neuwirth and Sami Rashid's motions to appear pro hac vice #5 #6 are granted. Mailed notice (cn).
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356545. (Rashid, Sami)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356481. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (lw, )
October 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Old World Industries, LLC (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Old World Industries, LLC by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Old World Industries, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16289569.(Schapiro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old World Industries, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Mohan
Represented By: Sean Christopher Gingrich
Represented By: Daniel J. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old World Industries, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?