Tooley v. Woodfield Mall LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. and Woodfield Mall LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06569
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' motions for extension of time to file responsive pleadings by 12/16/2019 #12 and #16 are granted. No appearance is required on 11/4/2019. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa M Hewitt for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Woodfield Mall LLC for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Woodfield Mall LLC by Melissa M Hewitt (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. for extension of time Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.'s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Mason, Jody)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. by Julia Pearce Argentieri (Argentieri, Julia)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. by Jody Kahn Mason (Mason, Jody)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 1/21/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Tooley as to Woodfield Mall LLC on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. served on WOODFIELD MALL LLC through Registered Agent CT Corporation System on October 9, 2019 (Coffman, Brian) Modified on 10/24/2019 (bg, ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Tooley as to Nordstrom, Inc. on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. served on NORDSTROM, INC. through Registered Agent Corporate Creations Network on October 10, 2019 (Coffman, Brian) Modified on 10/24/2019 (bg, ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Tooley as to Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. served on Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. through Registered Agent Corporate Creations Network on October 10, 2019 (Coffman, Brian) Modified on 10/24/2019 (bg, ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Tooley as to J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. served on J.C. PENNEY CORPORATION, INC through Registered Agent CT Corporation on 10-09-2019 (Coffman, Brian) Modified on 10/24/2019 (bg, ).
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Woodfield Mall LLC (kl, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
October 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David M. Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dennis Tooley by Brian W. Coffman (Coffman, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coffman, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Tooley; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16301061.(Coffman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tooley v. Woodfield Mall LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Represented By: Jody Kahn Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodfield Mall LLC
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Represented By: Brian W. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?