Tooley v. Vanguard Equities, LLC
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Defendant: VANGUARD EQUITIES, LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Company and Vanguard Equities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06572
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 Case List Filed by Plaintiff by Dennis Tooley (Coffman, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Status hearing on December 11, 2019 (Dckt. No. #15 ) is stricken and reset for January 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion hearing held on November 13, 2019. Counsel discussed the Joint Initial Status report. The Court discussed Defendant's statement in its memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss [Dckt. No. #10 ]. Defendant alleged that Plaintiff has filed 59 lawsuits in federal court for alleged ADA violations. [Dckt. No. #10 ]. The Court directs Plaintiff's counsel to file a list of each ADA lawsuit that Plaintiff has filed in the past five years. The list must include the case name, the case number, the jurisdiction (meaning the judicial district), and the year filed. In light of Plaintiff's amended complaint [Dckt. No. #13 ], Defendant informed the Court that it plans to file its response in the next few weeks. Status hearing set for December 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion hearing set for November 13, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. #11 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 First AMENDED complaint by Dennis Tooley against Vanguard Equities, LLC (Coffman, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Vanguard Equities, LLC (Iveljic, Mario)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Mario M Iveljic for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Iveljic, Mario)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Vanguard Equities, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #9 Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Iveljic, Mario)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Vanguard Equities, LLC to dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) (Iveljic, Mario)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Vanguard Equities, LLC by Mario M Iveljic (Iveljic, Mario)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dennis Tooley regarding Summons and Complaint served on VANGUARD EQUITIES, LLC through Registered Agent Michael Balourdos on October 15, 2019 (Coffman, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dennis Tooley regarding Summons and Complaint served on VANGUARD EQUITIES, LLC through Registered Agent Michael Balourdos on October 15, 2019 (Coffman, Brian)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Vanguard Equities, LLC (axc, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction regarding summons issued entry. (ecw, )
October 7, 2019 ENTERED in Error (axc, ) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ecw, ).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
October 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dennis Tooley by Brian W. Coffman (Coffman, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coffman, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Tooley; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16301617.(Coffman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tooley v. Vanguard Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD EQUITIES, LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Equities, LLC
Represented By: Mario M Iveljic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Represented By: Brian W. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?