Ali v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Abdulelah Ali
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj, Acting Director of F David Bowdich and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv06584
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/20 at 9:30 a.m. Discovery is stayed. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report by David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 11/26/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Oswald, Craig)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (kl, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
October 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abdulelah Ali by Reem H Odeh (Odeh, Reem)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Abdulelah Ali; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16303718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Odeh, Reem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulelah Ali
Represented By: Reem H Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?