Cole et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brian J. Cole and Emily B. Cole
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv06648
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States of America by Samuel Patrick Jones (Jones, Samuel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Mary A. Stallings for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Stallings, Mary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant United States of America for extension of time to file answer and to Reset the Initial Status Hearing (Stallings, Mary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian J. Cole, Emily B. Cole as to United States of America served on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (Tahmassebi, Amir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 and #6 are granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 25, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant United States of America. (ng, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Hancock, Virginia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian J. Cole, Emily B. Cole as to United States of America served on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Tahmassebi, Amir)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16342450. (Hoard, Vivian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16341893. (Gardner, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
October 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jg, )
October 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brian J. Cole, Emily B. Cole by Amir R. Tahmassebi (Tahmassebi, Amir)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tahmassebi, Amir)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brian J. Cole, Emily B. Cole; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16313141. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tahmassebi, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Samuel Patrick Jones
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Cole
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Represented By: Robert Brian Gardner, III
Represented By: Vivian Denise Hoard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily B. Cole
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?