Super Products LLC v. ReyCo LLC et al
Plaintiff: Super Products LLC
Defendant: Steve Engle, ReyCo LLC and Raymond L Almada
Case Number: 1:2019cv06664
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel reports that defendant Steven Engle intends to file for bankruptcy protection. For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiff's motion for default #12 is granted, and an order of default is entered against defendants ReyCo, LLC and Raymond Almada. Plaintiff has leave to notice a motion for default judgment for presentment on the court's normal motion call. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Super Products LLC (Whitney, Zach)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Zach S. Whitney for presentment of motion for entry of default #12 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Whitney, Zach)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Super Products LLC for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Zach Whitney in Support of Motion to Enter Default)(Whitney, Zach)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION that no Initial Discovery Responses Need to be Served (Whitney, Zach)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 12/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Defendant Steve Engle (Hampilos, George)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Super Products LLC as to Steve Engle on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Whitney, Zach)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Super Products LLC as to Raymond L Almada on 10/13/2019. (Whitney, Zach)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Super Products LLC as to ReyCo LLC on 10/13/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Whitney, Zach)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
October 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Raymond L Almada, Steve Engle, ReyCo LLC (axc, )
October 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Super Products LLC (Whitney, Zach)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Super Products LLC by Zach S. Whitney (Whitney, Zach)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Whitney, Zach)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Super Products LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16317225. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lease, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 - Lease, #5 Exhibit 5 - Lease, #6 Exhibit 6 - Lease)(Whitney, Zach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Products LLC v. ReyCo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Products LLC
Represented By: Zach S. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReyCo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond L Almada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?