Patino v. Sheen Cleaners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosa A Patino
Defendant: 17's Cleaners & Tailors, Inc., Ruby Cleaners & Outlet, Inc., Sheen Cleaners, Inc., Sook Roh, Sookja Susan Roh and Susan Roh
Case Number: 1:2019cv06817
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint, filed by Plaintiff Rosa A Patino. (Becerra, Carlos)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 17's Cleaners & Tailors, Inc., Sook Roh, Ruby Cleaners & Outlet, Inc., Sheen Cleaners, Inc. by Ryan J. Kim (Kim, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa A Patino as to Sook Roh on 12/1/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Becerra, Carlos)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa A Patino as to Sheen Cleaners, Inc. on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Becerra, Carlos)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa A Patino as to Ruby Cleaners & Outlet, Inc. on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Becerra, Carlos)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa A Patino as to 17's Cleaners & Tailors, Inc. on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Becerra, Carlos)
November 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 17's Cleaners & Tailors, Inc., Sook Roh, Ruby Cleaners & Outlet, Inc., Sheen Cleaners, Inc. (txl, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 12/16/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
October 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rosa A Patino by Carlos Gerardo Becerra (Becerra, Carlos)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Becerra, Carlos)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rosa A Patino; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16338651.(Becerra, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patino v. Sheen Cleaners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17's Cleaners & Tailors, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Cleaners & Outlet, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheen Cleaners, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sook Roh
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sookja Susan Roh
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Roh
Represented By: Ryan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa A Patino
Represented By: Carlos Gerardo Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?