Mrza v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Marln Mrza
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan and David Bowdich
Case Number: 1:2019cv06818
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:On the Court's own motion, the 12/19/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Oswald, Craig)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan. (kl, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jg, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jjr, )
October 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marln Mrza by Mohammed W Ibrahim (Ibrahim, Mohammed)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marln Mrza; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16338714. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Ibrahim, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mrza v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowdich
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marln Mrza
Represented By: Mohammed W Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?