Green Dolphin Capital LLC et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Green Dolphin Capital LLC, MK 2011 LLC, Gary Rappeport and TM 2011 LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06940
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: By agreement between the parties, briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to dismiss #16 is modified as follows: Plaintiffs shall file a response brief on or before January 20, 2020. Defendants shall file a reply brief on or before February 14, 2020. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #18 is granted. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to dismiss #16 : Plaintiffs' response is due 1/6/20; Defendants' reply is due 1/27/20. The Court will rule by mail. No appearance necessary on 12/10/19. Initial status hearing set for 1/16/20 is stricken. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Peter Conway for presentment of motion to seal #18 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Conway, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conway, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to seal (Conway, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 Redacted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conway, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Conway, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Green Dolphin Capital LLC, MK 2011 LLC, Gary Rappeport, TM 2011 LLC (Wood, Hal)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Green Dolphin Capital LLC, MK 2011 LLC, Gary Rappeport, TM 2011 LLC by Matthew R. Barrett (Barrett, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Green Dolphin Capital LLC, MK 2011 LLC, Gary Rappeport, TM 2011 LLC by Hal J. Wood (Wood, Hal)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' agreed motion for briefing schedule and leave to file exhibit to Plaintiffs' complaint under seal #9 is granted. Defendants to file responsive pleading by 11/26/19. In the event defendants elect to file a motion rather than answering, the Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule: Defendants' motion due 11/26/19; Plaintiffs' response due 12/30/19; and Defendants' reply due 1/17/20. No appearance necessary on 10/30/19. Initial status hearing is set for 1/16/20 at 8:30a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. regarding MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to set a briefing schedule (Agreed)MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to seal document (Agreed) #9 (Conway, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Peter Conway for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule,, motion to seal document, #9 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Conway, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to set a briefing schedule (Agreed), MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to seal document (Agreed) (Conway, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
October 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Erin Kies DeGrand (DeGrand, Erin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Melissa B. Hirst (Hirst, Melissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Conway, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Michael Peter Conway (Conway, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Conway, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L010170) filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16360486. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Conway, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Dolphin Capital LLC et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Dolphin Capital LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Hal J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MK 2011 LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Hal J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Rappeport
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Hal J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TM 2011 LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Hal J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a JPMorgan Private Bank
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Represented By: Michael Peter Conway
Represented By: Melissa B. Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Represented By: Michael Peter Conway
Represented By: Melissa B. Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Represented By: Michael Peter Conway
Represented By: Melissa B. Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Represented By: Michael Peter Conway
Represented By: Melissa B. Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?