OMCG, Inc. v. KC Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OMCG, Inc.
Defendant: KC Logistics, Inc. and C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06962
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Young B Kim
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by OMCG, Inc. (Naumann, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff OMCG, Inc.. (Naumann, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service (Mccabe, Adam)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Correction regarding #21 (sxb, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 Entered in Error (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 12/2/2019 (sxb, ).
November 29, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: On November 22, 2019, the court ordered Plaintiff and Defendant C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. ("CH") to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 by November 27, 2019. (R. 18.) Defendant CH timely complied with this order, (R. 19), but Plaintiff did not. Plaintiff is ordered to explain, by December 4, 2019, why it failed to comply with this order and why it should not be subject to sanctions for its failure. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure STATEMENT by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. (Jordan, Kenderick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties are ordered to adhere to the following written discovery schedule: (1) exchange MIDP disclosures by December 2, 2019; (2) serve written discovery requests (except for requests to admit) by December 16, 2019; (3) serve answers to written discovery requests by January 17, 2020; (4) confer about the adequacy of the discovery responses by January 31, 2020; and (5) file a joint status report identifying each side's written discovery issues, along with the relevant written discovery responses as exhibits, by February 7, 2020. The court will not consider general objections to written discovery requests if the court must address and rule on written discovery disputes. If the parties do not have any disputed written discovery issues, a status report is not required. A status hearing is scheduled for February 11, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019 to discuss the written discovery issues identified. Plaintiff and Defendant C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. are ordered to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 by November 27, 2019. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C)for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/22/2019.(las, ) Modified on 11/26/2019 (las, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. by Kenderick Mason Jordan (Jordan, Kenderick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: This case has been submitted to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Magistrate Judge Kim, based on the parties' consent to his jurisdiction #14 . The status hearing on 2/18/20 before Judge Shah is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Naumann, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OMCG, Inc. by Robert K Naumann (Naumann, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties indicate their consent to proceed before the magistrate judge #11 , and must execute and file the attached Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction form. This case will be submitted to the Executive Committee for reassignment as soon as the form is filed. All fact discovery must be noticed in time to be completed by 4/21/20. In the event the Consent form does not get executed, a status hearing is set for 2/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (Attachments: #1 consent form) (psm, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff OMCG, Inc.. (Naumann, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 11/19/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, OMCG, Inc. by KC Logistics, Inc.(Mccabe, Adam)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.(Reeb, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. by Robert Lee Reeb (Reeb, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 E-MAILED notice of removal letter to Robert K Naumann (las, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
October 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B.Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KC Logistics, Inc. by Adam Harold Mccabe (Mccabe, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Belgrade, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KC Logistics, Inc. by Steven Brian Belgrade (Belgrade, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, County of DuPage, State of Illinois, case number (2019AR001416) filed by KC Logistics, Inc. ($400 receipt number 0752-16362934) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing)(Belgrade, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OMCG, Inc. v. KC Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMCG, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K Naumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Harold Mccabe
Represented By: Steven Brian Belgrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?