Genpact LLC v. Kapoor
Plaintiff: GENPACT LLC
Defendant: RAJAT KAPOOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv06964
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Genpact LLC. Rajat Kapoor waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Schlueter, Tobias)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Joint status report due by 1/3/2020. Status hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/4/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 23, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rajat Kapoor (sxb, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GENPACT LLC by Tobias Edward Schlueter (Schlueter, Tobias)
October 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GENPACT LLC (Drake, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Entered in Error (Drake, John) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GENPACT LLC by John A Drake (Drake, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GENPACT LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16362870. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drake, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genpact LLC v. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJAT KAPOOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENPACT LLC
Represented By: Tobias Edward Schlueter
Represented By: John A Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?