Royal Garden Produce, LLC v. Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Royal Garden Produce, LLC
Defendant: Alejandro Sanchez Gutierrez, Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation and Cesar Sanchez Gutierrez
Case Number: 1:2019cv07001
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 1/23/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 1/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Royal Garden Produce, LLC as to Alejandro Sanchez Gutierrez on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Klinowski, Jason)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Royal Garden Produce, LLC as to Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Klinowski, Jason)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Royal Garden Produce, LLC as to Cesar Sanchez Gutierrez on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Klinowski, Jason)
October 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation, Alejandro Sanchez Gutierrez, Cesar Sanchez Gutierrez (mc, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Royal Garden Produce, LLC (Klinowski, Jason)
October 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Royal Garden Produce, LLC by Jason Ryan Klinowski (Klinowski, Jason)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Klinowski, Jason)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Royal Garden Produce, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16368588. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Klinowski, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Garden Produce, LLC v. Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Garden Produce, LLC
Represented By: Jason Ryan Klinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Sanchez Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez Bros. Produce LLC T/A Sanchez Bros. Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Sanchez Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?