Panama Banana Dist. Co. v. Luna Imports, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Panama Banana Dist. Co.
Defendant: Jose G. Guiterrez, Luna Imports, LLC and Jose G. Gutierrez
Case Number: 1:2019cv07034
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to reopen case #27 is entered and continued to 1/8/20 at 09:30 a.m. Motion hearing date of 12/3/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION regarding motion to reopen case #27 Stipulation and Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Joint Motion, #2 Exhibit Unexecuted Consent Judgment)(Fassett, Mary)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing Refund Of Bond: UPON consideration of Defendant's Notice of Full Payment [Doc. 22], Plaintiff's Notice of Receipt of Payment of Amount Set Forth in Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. 23], and Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #24 ], and the Court having entered an Order Dissolving the Temporary Restraining Order on November 6, 2019 [Doc. #26 ] (the "Order"), and finding it appropriate to revise the provisions in the Order concerning the refund of bond to Plaintiff, it is hereby,ORDERED, that the Clerk's Office is directed to refund in full the $1,000.00 bond posted by Plaintiff, plus all accrued interest thereon, to Plaintiff, Panama Banana Dist. Co., forthwith, and forward said refund to Plaintiff's counsel, William B. Kohn, Esq., 29 E. Madison Street, Suite 1000, Chicago, Illinois 60602. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/20/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Jean Fassett for presentment of motion to reopen case #27 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/3/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fassett, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. to reopen case Unopposed Motion to Re-Open Case (Fassett, Mary)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/6/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of withdrawal of motion for preliminary injunction #24 , Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #8 is withdrawn. Enter Order Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order. Motion hearing set for 11/14/19 is stricken. This case is now moot and is, therefore, dismissed. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Panama Banana Dist. Co. re MOTION by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. for preliminary injunction #8 Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Fassett, Mary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Panama Banana Dist. Co. re order on motion for temporary restraining order,,,,,,,, order on motion for preliminary injunction,,,,,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, order on motion for relief,,,,,,, #19 Plaintiff's Notice of Receipt of Payment of Amount Set Forth in Temporary Restraining Order (Fassett, Mary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Full Payment by Jose G. Gutierrez, Luna Imports, LLC of Amount Set Forth in TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Check and Receipt for Payment)(Gardner, Mary)
November 1, 2019 BOND in the amount of $1,000.00, Receipt No. 4624232672, posted by Panama Banana Dist. Co. (lma, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. shall deposit with the Court One thousand dollars ($1,000) cash, cashier's check or surety bond as security. The Clerk's office is authorized to receive the payment into the Court's registry until further order. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED reply #17 Amended Exhibit to Objection to Proposed TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 Operating Agmt., #2 Exhibit Part 2 Operating Agmt)(Gardner, Mary)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/31/2019: Plaintiff's motion #7 for temporary restraining order is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion #8 for preliminary injunction is entered and continued to November 14, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. It is ordered that defendants, their customers, agents, officers, subsidiaries, assigns, and banking institutions shall not alienate, dissipate, pay over or assign any assets of defendant Luna except for payment to plaintiff until further order of this Court or until defendants pay plaintiff the principal sum of $80,782.49, by cashier's check, delivered to plaintiff's counsel, William B. Kohn, Esq., for the benefit of plaintiff, at which time the Order is dissolved. It is further ordered that in the event defendants fail to pay plaintiff the principal sum of $80,782.49 by cashier's check within two (2) business days of service of this Order, then the defendants shall file with this Court (with a copy to plaintiff's counsel) an accounting which identifies the assets and liabilities and each account receivable of defendant Luna, signed under penalty of perjury; and that defendants shall also supply to plaintiff's counsel, William B. Kohn, Esq., within five (5) days of the date of the Order, any and all documents in connection with defendant Luna's assets and liabilities and those of related and subsidiary companies, including, but not limited to, the most recent bank statements for the last 3 months, including canceled checks, balance sheets, profit/loss statements, accounts receivable reports, accounts payable reports, accounts paid records, and income tax returns. Bond shall be set at $1,000.00. This Temporary Restraining Order is entered this 31st day of October, 2019, at 2:00 p.m and will expire on November 14, 2019 at noon. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. to objections, #16 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Temporary Restraining Order's Reference to Non-Party Companies (Fassett, Mary)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held and continued to 11/13/19 at 09:30 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's emergency motion for temporary restraining order with notice #7 and Motion for preliminary injunction #8 are entered and continued. The Court will rule electronically. The Clerk is directed to change the spelling of the last name of Defendant Guiterrez to Gutierrez. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS by Jose G. Guiterrez, Luna Imports, LLC to MOTION by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. for temporary restraining order Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operating Agreement for Prosperous Connection LLC)(Gardner, Mary)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jose G. Guiterrez, Luna Imports, LLC by Mary Elizabeth Gardner (Gardner, Mary)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing previously set for 10/30/19 at 9:30 a.m. is reset to 10:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 29, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Luna Imports, LLC (lma, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Dean (Deke) K. Pappas regarding declaration, #10 Supplemental Declaration of Dean (Deke) K. Pappas in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Fassett, Mary)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED complaint by Panama Banana Dist. Co. against All Defendants (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Emergency Motion and Hearing NOTICE of Motion by Mary Jean Fassett for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #7 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Dean (Deke) K. Pappas regarding motion for temporary restraining order #7 , motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Panama Banana Dist. Co. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #7 , motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. for preliminary injunction (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. for temporary restraining order Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
October 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. by William Briskin Kohn as Local Counsel (Kohn, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Panama Banana Dist. Co. (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Panama Banana Dist. Co. by Mary Jean Fassett (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fassett, Mary)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Panama Banana Dist. Co.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16375153.(Fassett, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panama Banana Dist. Co. v. Luna Imports, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panama Banana Dist. Co.
Represented By: Mary Jean Fassett
Represented By: William Briskin Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose G. Guiterrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Imports, LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose G. Gutierrez
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?