Green v. Meeks et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Green
Defendant: Erin Mears-Attig, Rashida Pollion, Steven Meeks, Mary Zimmer, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., B White, John Shepherd, Vipin Shah, Unknown Wexford Doctor, Gail Walls, Mohammed Siddiqui, Kim Hugo and Michael Moldenhauer
Case Number: 1:2019cv07089
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Mary Zimmer by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Mary Zimmer by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to John Shepherd on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Grady, Sarah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED complaint by Victoria Green against All Defendants (Hazinski, John)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Steven Meeks waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Grady, Sarah)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Gaill Walls by Victoria Green (Envelope postmarked 11/27/2019). (mc, ) .
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Gail Walls waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 12/3/2019 (smm, ).
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Michael Moldenhauer on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Grady, Sarah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Erin Mears-Attig on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Mary Zimmer on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Mohammed Siddiqui on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 11/26/2019 (pj, ).
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Rashida Pollion on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; Vipin Shah on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Grady, Sarah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by John Thomas Hazinski (Hazinski, John)
November 19, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Kim Hugo. (txl, )
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kim Hugo, Erin Mears-Attig, Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Mary Zimmer (Lam, Tina)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Stephen H. Weil (Weil, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Sarah Copeland Grady (Grady, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Victoria Green; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16382371. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grady, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Meeks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Mears-Attig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashida Pollion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Zimmer
Represented By: Joseph Jack Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew H Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moldenhauer
Represented By: Joseph Jack Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew H Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Green
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Represented By: John Thomas Hazinski
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?