Bank of Hope v. J. B. Merchandise Co. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of Hope
Defendant: Sunrise Financial Limited, James Baik and J. B. Merchandise Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07103
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Bank of Hope against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank Merger Documents, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit Demand Letter)(Gattone, Wendy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct complaint #7 is granted.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Wendy Kaleta Gattone for presentment of motion to amend/correct #7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gattone, Wendy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of Hope to amend/correct complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Gattone, Wendy)
October 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of Hope by Kyle T Dillon (Dillon, Kyle)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of Hope by Nicholas Samuel Maragos (Maragos, Nicholas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of Hope by Thomas J. Dillon (Dillon, Thomas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of Hope by Wendy Kaleta Gattone (Gattone, Wendy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gattone, Wendy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclose Mortgage and for Other Relief filed by Bank of Hope; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16384187. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank Merger Documents, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Errata Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit Demand Letter)(Gattone, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Hope v. J. B. Merchandise Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Financial Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Merchandise Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Hope
Represented By: Nicholas Samuel Maragos
Represented By: Wendy Kaleta Gattone
Represented By: Kyle T Dillon
Represented By: Thomas J. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?