King v. Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Josette King
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07177
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted to 1/23/2020. No appearance required on 12/6/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Catherine E. James for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (James, Catherine)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Kohls Department Stores, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Catherine)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kohls Department Stores, Inc. by Catherine E. James (James, Catherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josette King as to Kohls Department Stores, Inc. on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 2/26/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 2/21/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
October 31, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kohls Department Stores, Inc. (axc, )
October 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Josette King by Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Josette King; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16394553. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette King
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine E. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?