Holy Hops, Inc. v. Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Holy Hops, Inc.
Defendant: Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07180
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. against Holy Hops, Inc. FOR DECLARTORY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Keith)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The briefing schedule as to Defendant's motion to dismiss complaint #31 is as follows: Plaintiff's response due by 1/13/2020. Reply due by 2/3/2020. The Court will rule electronically. Mailed notice (is, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. (Allen, Keith)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/11/2019: Plaintiff's motion to appoint receiver and for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction [1-2] is denied. [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice(is, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oddo, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court will consider defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to supplement as its response to the supplement itself. There will be no further briefing on plaintiff's motion to appoint receiver and for temporary restraining order unless requested by the Court. Mailed notice (is, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion to supplement its motion to appoint receiver and for temporary restraining order #24 is granted. Defendant, if it wishes, may file a response to the supplement, consisting of no more than three pages, by 12/6/19. Motion hearing noticed for 12/5/19 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to supplement Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Temporary Restraining Order Based on Newly Discovered Evidence #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Allen, Keith)
December 3, 2019 Filing 25 Emergency NOTICE of Motion by Thomas G. Oddo for presentment of motion to supplement #24 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oddo, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to supplement Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Temporary Restraining Order Based on Newly Discovered Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oddo, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file reply brief in excess of 15 pages #20 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 12/3/2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Correction re #21 (bg, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of motion by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Notice of Motion (Oddo, Thomas) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bg, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Motion to File Reply Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Oddo, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY by Holy Hops, Inc. to Response, #18 to Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Temporary Restraining Order (Oddo, Thomas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Defendant Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. in Opposition to Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Simon Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter of July 12, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Cummings Declaration)(Allen, Keith)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. by Adrian Mendoza, Jr (Mendoza, Adrian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to withdraw its emergency motion to remand #11 is granted. Plaintiff's emergency motion to appoint receiver and for TRO #6 is entered and continued. Defendant's response shall be filed by 11/18/2019; reply to be filed by 11/29/2019. The Court will issue its ruling by mail and will set a further dates, if necessary. Mailed notice (mw, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY by Holy Hops, Inc. to response to motion, #14 , MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to withdraw motion to remand #6 case to state court and motion for hearing on plaintiff's emergency motion to appoint receiver and for temp. restraining order #11 (Oddo, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to withdraw motion to remand #6 case to state court and motion for hearing on plaintiff's emergency motion to appoint receiver and for temp. restraining order #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter of June 28 2019, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Corp. Prop. Assocs. 14 Inc. v. CHR Holding Corp.,)(Allen, Keith)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. by Thomas G. Oddo for Adrian Mendoza (Oddo, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Withdraw Emergenry Motion to Remand and Motion for Hearing on Motion to Appoint Receiver and fro TRO NOTICE of Motion by Thomas G. Oddo for presentment of motion to withdraw #11 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oddo, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to withdraw motion to remand #6 case to state court and motion for hearing on plaintiff's emergency motion to appoint receiver and for temp. restraining order (Oddo, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's emergency motion to remand or for hearing on emergency motion to appoint receiver and for TRO #6 is entered and continued. As stated on the record, the Court will first determine jurisdiction. Plaintiff's request for leave to file reply is granted. The Court will issue its ruling by mail and will set a further date if necessary. Mailed notice (mw,)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to remand to State Court #6 (Allen, Keith)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas G. Oddo for presentment of motion to remand #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oddo, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. to remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oddo, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Holy Hops, Inc. by Thomas G. Oddo (Oddo, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. by Bruce N. Menkes (Menkes, Bruce)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. by Keith E Allen (Allen, Keith)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Allen, Keith)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, DuPage County, Illinois, case number (2019 CH 001230) filed by Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16395038. 2019 CH 001230 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Emergency Motion)(Allen, Keith)
October 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holy Hops, Inc. v. Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holy Hops, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Oddo
Represented By: Adrian Mendoza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beer Church Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E Allen
Represented By: Bruce N. Menkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?