Nordstrom v. Dial Senior Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nordstrom
Defendant: Dial Senior Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07183
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 , Plaintiff's response is due by 01/13/2020. Defendant's reply is due by 02/03/2020. Discovery is stayed during the pendency of the motion, but defense counsel must have another communication with Defendant to ensure that a comprehensive litigation hold is in place. Plaintiff also may confer with the defense about the scope of the litigation hold if there is any concern. Status hearing of 12/17/2019 is reset to 03/04/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Jennifer Nordstrom (Ficzko, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/17/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Dial Senior Management, Inc. to dismiss Dial Senior Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed extension motion #8 to respond to the complaint is granted to 12/04/2019. Initial status hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 9 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Nordstrom by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Nordstrom by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Nordstrom by Andrew C. Ficzko (Ficzko, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/12/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Dial Senior Management, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Wolfe, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pk, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dial Senior Management, Inc. by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
October 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dial Senior Management, Inc. (Wolfe, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dial Senior Management, Inc. by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolfe, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019CH11108) filed by Dial Senior Management, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16395755. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Blanke, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal in State Court)(Wolfe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordstrom v. Dial Senior Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nordstrom
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Senior Management, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?