Reynolds v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paula Reynolds
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07188
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants the parties' motion to stay pending appeal #9 . The parties should appear on 1/7/20 to report on whether the Seventh Circuit has issued an opinion by that date. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer W. Weller for presentment of motion to stay #9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Weller, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. to stay (Agreed Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Weller, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Reynolds as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
November 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (acm, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
November 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vlahakis, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paula Reynolds by James C. Vlahakis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vlahakis, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paula Reynolds; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16397038.(Vlahakis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Reynolds
Represented By: James C. Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Jennifer W. Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?