Taylor v. Malkowski et al.
Plaintiff: Terence Taylor
Defendant: Medical Technician Bobby, Mary Ellen Grennan, Unknown Health Care Employees, Major Magarvie, Marcus Hardy, Michael Lemke, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Johnson, Victor Calloway, Rebecca Buczkowski, Guy Pierce, Unknown Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Employees, Naveen Nagpal, Correctional Officer John Doe 1, Meghan Foley, Kristi Eschleman, Michael Magana, Latanya Williams, Unknown Illinois Department of Corrections Employees, Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Cynthia Garcia, Tarry Williams, Jenny McGarvey, Ghaliah Obaisi, Lt Randy Malkowski, Jane Roe, Kimberly Kelly, Royce Brown-Reed, Doretta O'Brien and Dr. Saleh Obaisi
Case Number: 1:2019cv07211
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 198 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/23/2019. (bg, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 197 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 12/19/2019. Referral to Magistrate Judge for settlement conference. Status hearing set for 3/3/2020 at 9:30 AM to set trial date. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 196 STATUS Report (Joint) by Terence Taylor (Thompson, Tara)
November 18, 2019 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 1:30 PM. The parties are required to file a joint status report by 12/12/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 194 MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (kp, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 193 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 1:16-cv-01336 (kp)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/25/2019. Plaintiff originally filed his complaint in the Northern District of Illinois, but ultimately filed an amended complaint alleging claims involving both Stateville Correctional Center and Pontiac Correctional Center. Defendants sought leave to transfer the entire matter to the Central District of Illinois, and the motion was granted over Plaintiff's objection. On March 26, 2019, the Court granted summary judgment as to all Pontiac Correctional Center claims and Defendants. Plaintiff has now filed a Motion to Transfer the case back to the Northern District of Illinois #190 . 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) states a court may transfer a civil action "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses" to "any other district or division where it might have been brought or to any district or division to which all parties have consented." #190 . Defendants have no objection to the motion #192 . Therefore, the Motion to Transfer Venue is granted pursuant 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) #190 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to vacate all settings and transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois. (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 192 RESPONSE to Motion re #190 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendants Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Randy Malkowski, Jenny McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal. (Taborga, Remy) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Remy Taborga on behalf of All Defendants (Taborga, Remy) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/4/2019. Defendants must file a response to Plaintiff's motion to transfer within 14 days of service indicating whether they have any objection to the motion.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 190 MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Shadid: Parties present via telephone Atty Tara Thompson on behalf of the Plaintiff and Attys Stephanie Kevil and Helen Lozano on behalf of the Defendants for a Status Conference on Tuesday, 9/17/2019. The parties discussed mediation, the possibility of changing venue, and possibility of consent to the magistrate. Plaintiff may file a motion addressing venue if appropriate. The parties were encouraged to continue talking and may request mediation prior to the trial date. The Court will abide by the following scheduling deadlines: 1) any motions in limine must be filed on or before March 6, 2020; 2) Defendants may file a motion addressing security concerns with an appropriate affidavit on or before March 6, 2020; see Perotti v Quinones, 2015 WL 3825014 (7th Cir. June 22, 2015) 3) any response to a motion in limine or response to motion addressing security concerns must be filed on or before March 13, 2020; 4) a joint, proposed pretrial order must be filed on or before March 13, 2020; 5) a pretrial conference is scheduled by telephone conference call with counsel on March 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. and 6) a jury trial is scheduled for April 6, 2020 at 9:00. No writs to issue at this time. The Plaintiff and Defendants shall appear in person at trial. Inmates of the Illinois Department of Corrections who are not parties to this case shall appear by video conference and Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) employees who are not parties may also appear by video conference at trial. Other nonparty witnesses may appear by video at the court's discretion. Therefore, the proposed pretrial order must include: (1) the name, inmate number and place of incarceration for each inmate to be called as a witness; (2) the name and place of employment for each IDOC employee to be called as a witness; and, (3) the names and addresses of any witnesses who are not inmates or employees for whom a party seeks a trial subpoena. The party seeking the subpoena must provide the necessary witness and mileage fees pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. At the request of defense counsel, Clerk is directed to terminate Attys Stephanie Kevil and Patrick Morris from the docket. (Court Reporter NM) (JRK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Helen Alicia Lozano on behalf of Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Randy Malkowski, Jenny McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal (Lozano, Helen) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/4/2019. This cause is set for a telephone status conference with counsel to discuss potential pretrial and trial dates on September 17, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk will initiate the call. Plaintiff must also be prepared to clarify his claims alleging Defendants failed to intervene to stop an assault by officers. See July 16, 2019 Order, p. 17-18.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: In light of the presettlement statement and the history of negotiations in this case, the Court concludes that a settlement conference would be fruitless. Settlement conference set for 8/30/19 is VACATED and the #187 Writ Issued for Personal Appearance is withdrawn. Entered on 8/29/19. (WG, ilcd) Modified on 8/30/2019 (WG, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 188 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/31/2019 10:24:36 AM ]. File Size [ 3383 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:03 ]. (admin). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 187 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testficandum issued to Hill Correctional Center as to Terence Taylor for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 am. (JS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone with Atty Tara Thompson for Plaintiff and Atty Phil Rehani for Defendants for Status Conference held on 7/31/2019. Discussion held re settlement conference procedure. Plaintiff's counsel to confer with co-counsel and plaintiff and submit new written settlement demand to defendants counsel. Settlement Conference is set for Friday, 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C in Peoria before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Clerk to issue writ for Plaintiff's in person appearance. Parties to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement stating their position in regards to settlement by 8/27/2019. This shall include the history of offers and demands along with a brief statement of position on facts and legal issues. Do not file this statement with the Clerk's Office or exchange with opposing parties. Parties have leave of court to email the statement directly to chambers at hawley@ilcd.uscourts.gov. (Tape #PR-C 10:24 AM.) (JS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #186 Motion reschedule. Pre-settlement Conference set for 7/30/19 is VACATED and RESET to 7/31/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/24/19. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 186 MOTION Reschedule 7-30-19 Status Hearing by Defendants Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Randy Malkowski, Jenny McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal. Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/19/2019. As Plaintiff is represented by counsel, Plaintiff's appearance is not necessary for the 7/30/2019 pre-settlement status conference, and no writ shall issue.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: This case having been referred to Magistrate Judge Hawley for settlement conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1., a Pre-settlement Status Conference is set for 7/30/19 at 2:00 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Clerk is directed to issue a telephone writ for plaintiff's participation in the conference. Entered on 7/16/2019. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/16/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) The IDOC Defendants' motion for summary judgment is also granted as to Defendants Pontiac Correctional Center Warden Guy Pierce and Stateville Correctional Center Assistant Warden Doretta OBrien. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 56. The Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss Defendants O'Brien and Pierce. The Plaintiff's surviving claims are as outlined in this order. 2) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Hawley for settlement conference. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Remark: The 5/21/2019 docket entry was returned as an undeliverable email address as to Patrick D Morris. Attorney Patrick D Morris email account disabled, as he is no longer with the AG's Office. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial filed by Defendants Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce. (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 5/20/2019. Defendants' motion for a seven day extension to respond to Plaintiff's memorandum is granted #183 . Defendants must file a response on or before May 24, 2019.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 183 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Shadid: Parties present via phone, Attorney Tara Thompson for Plaintiff and Attorney Stephanie Kevil for Defendants for Status Conference held on 5/3/2019. Defendants to file a response within 14 days (5/17/2019. Parties express interest in mediation. Court will set any further scheduling deadlines after considering additional briefing. (Court Reporter JJ.) (VH, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM Further Submission in Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Terence Taylor. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/30/2019. The motion to reschedule the May 2, 2019, status hearing is granted. #181 The hearing is now scheduled for May 3, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone conference call. The Clerk will initiate the call.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/29/2019. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to make an additional summary judgment filing #180 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until 5/1/2019 to make such a filing.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 181 MOTION Reschedule May 2, 2019 Status Hearing by Defendants Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Randy Malkowski, Jenny McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce. Responses due by 5/13/2019 (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Submission by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 5/9/2019 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/17/2019. This cause is set for a telephone status hearing on May 2, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss further scheduling deadlines. The Clerk will initiate the call and will use the numbers identified in the docket.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 179 STATUS REPORT Confirmation of Representation by Doretta O'Brien. (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stephanie A Kevil on behalf of Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Randy Malkowski, Jenny McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce (Kevil, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 3/27/2019. The Court modifies the summary judgment order #177 entered on 3/26/19. IDOC Defendants' motion for summary judgment #156 is not reserved as to Defendant Pierce. On the grounds raised by Pierce in the motion, the motion is DENIED as to Pierce. However, as the Court stated in the summary judgment order, the Court will sua sponte grant summary judgment to Pierce thirty days from the date of the summary judgment order for lack of causation, unless Plaintiff presents evidence to establish otherwise. See the summary judgment order #177 for the full text of the Court's order. Further, since Attorney Johnson is no longer with the Attorney General's Office, the Court modifies the summary judgment order as follows: Attorney Patrick D. Morris is directed to advise the Court, within fourteen days, of the status of Defendant O'Brien's representation. (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 3/26/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Wexford Defendants' motion to strike #170 is DENIED. 2) Wexford Defendants' motion for summary judgment #155 is GRANTED. 3) Estate Defendant's motion for summary judgment #157 is GRANTED. 4) IDOC Defendants' motion for summary judgment #156 is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part. The Court grants summary judgment to Defendants Lemke, Eschleman, Buczkowski, Tarry Williams, Magana, Brown-Reed, Calloway, Grennan, Kelley, and Pierce, in his personal capacity, on Plaintiff's claims of denial of medical care and failure to intervene in the denial of medical care. The Court grants summary judgment to Defendant Nagpal on Plaintiff's claim of failure to intervene in the denial of medical care and denies summary judgment to Nagpal on Plaintiff's claim of denial of medical care. The Court reserves ruling on Defendant Pierce's motion for summary judgment in his official capacity. The Court will grant summary judgment to Pierce thirty days from the date of this order for lack of causation, unless Plaintiff presents evidence to establish otherwise. Should Plaintiff respond, Pierce has fourteen days to reply. 5) Attorney Johnson is directed to advise the Court, within fourteen days, of the status of Defendant O'Brien's representation. 6) The Court will grant summary judgment to Defendant O'Brien thirty days from the date of this order for lack of personal involvement, unless Plaintiff presents evidence to establish otherwise. Should Plaintiff respond, O'Brien has fourteen days to reply. 7) The following claims remain for trial: (a) denial of medical care against Defendant Nagpal; (b) failure to protect against Defendants McGarvey, Durrett, Malkowski, and Griffin; (c) failure to intervene against Defendants McGarvey, Durrett, Malkowski, and Griffin; and (d) intentional infliction of emotional distress against Defendants McGarvey, Durrett, Malkowski, and Nagpal. Plaintiff also seeks to enforce the State's obligation to indemnify IDOC Defendants or pay any judgments against them. The Court's rulings on the claims against Defendant O'Brien and Defendant Pierce in his official capacity are pending. 8) The Clerk of Court is directed to correct the spelling of Defendants' names on the docket as follows: Cyndi Garcia should be Cynthia Garcia, Latonya Williams should be LaTanya Williams, Royce Brown Reed should be Royce Brown-Reed, A. W. Calloway should be Victor Calloway, McGarvey should be Jenny McGarvey, Tralon Durett should be Tralon Durrett, Kimberly Kelly should be Kimberly Kelley, Kristi Eschleman should be Krisi Eschleman, and Becky Buczowski should be Rebecca Buczkowski. 9) The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendants Major Magarvie, Medtec Bobby, Medical Technician Bobby, Mr. Johnson, Correctional Officer John Doe 1, Jane Roe, Unknown Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Employees, Unknown Health Care Employees, Unknown Illinois Department of Corrections Employees, Cynthia Garcia, Meghan Foley, LaTanya Williams, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Ghaliah Obaisi, Michael Lemke, Krisi Eschleman, Rebecca Buczkowski, Tarry Williams, Michael Magana, Royce Brown-Reed, Victor Calloway, Mary Ellen Grennan, and Kimberly Kelley as parties to this case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry S. Lu (Lu, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER striking #175 the Plaintiff's Motion for status and notice of change of address. The docket reflects that the Plaintiff has counsel. Therefore, the Plaintiff must communicate with the Court only through his counsel. All filings are to be signed by counsel of record. Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). The Plaintiff's letter #175 is not signed by counsel and is therefore stricken. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/10/2018. (KZ, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 175 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 12/10/2018 MOTION for Status (filed in letter form) by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 12/21/2018 (FDS, ilcd) Modified on 12/10/2018 (SAG, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terence Taylor. New address is Hill Correctional Center, P.O. Box 1700, Galesburg, IL 61401. (FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Phillip Waleed Rehani on behalf of Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Malkowski, McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams (Rehani, Phillip) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 172 RESPONSE to Motion re #170 MOTION to Strike #163 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #165 Exhibit, filed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Summary Judgment by Andrew Tilden and Wexford Health Sources, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Riliwan Ojealde)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Support re #170 MOTION to Strike #163 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #165 Exhibit, filed by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 170 MOTION to Strike #163 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #165 Exhibit, by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. Responses due by 8/7/2018 (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patrick D Morris on behalf of Bobby, Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Medical Technician Bobby, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams (Morris, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rupcich, Joseph)[Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ghaliah Obaisi. (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 7/6/2018. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file his responses to the three pending motions for summary judgment instanter is granted. #166 (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INSTANTER re #164 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #163 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #162 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #165 Exhibit, by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 7/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 165 Exhibit re #163 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #164 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, #162 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition by Terence Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial filed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 6/28/2018. Plaintiff's unopposed fourth motion for an extension of time to file a response to the pending motions for summary judgment is granted. #161 Plaintiff must file a response on or before July 3, 2018. (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 161 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Unopposed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 7/11/2018 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 6/20/2018. Plaintiff has filed a third, unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the pending dispositive motions. #160 Plaintiff's counsel explains he needs one final opportunity to speak with Plaintiff at Menard Correctional Center, but a phone call could not be arranged until June 25, 2018. Therefore, the motion is granted. #160 Plaintiff must file a response on or before June 27, 2018. (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 160 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Unopposed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 7/3/2018 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 6/14/2018. Plaintiff has filed an unopposed, second request for an extension of time to respond to the three pending motions for summary judgment. #159 Plaintiff's counsel notes he met with Plaintiff, but did not have an opportunity to complete his conversation concerning the response. Therefore, Plaintiff requests an extension to June 20, 2018 to file a response. The motion is granted. #159 Both the Plaintiff and the Defendants ask the Court to reset the current June 28, 2018 pretrial date and the July 30, 2018 trial date. The joint motion is granted. #159 The Court will reset the dates after consideration of the pending motions. The Clerk of the Court is directed to vacate the pretrial and trial settings.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 159 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Unopposed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 6/26/2018 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 6/5/2018. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the pending motions for summary judgment is granted. #158 . Responses must be filed on or before June 13, 2018. (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 6/7/2018 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ghaliah Obaisi. Responses due by 6/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit A)(Rupcich, Joseph) Modified on 6/14/2018 to modify response deadline pursuant to Text Order 6/14/2018 (SAG, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Marcus Hardy, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Medical Technician Bobby, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. Responses due by 6/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Incident Reports, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Plaintiff's Dep Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - AD Grrievances, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - June 25, 2013 Grievance, #5 Exhibit October 30, 2014 Grievance)(Johnson, Erik) Modified on 6/5/2018 to modify response deadline pursuant to Text Order 6/5/2018 (SAG, ilcd). Modified on 6/14/2018 to modify response deadline pursuant to Text Order 6/14/2018(SAG, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 5/8/2018. The IDOC Defendants' motions for an extension of time to file a dispositive motion are granted. #151 , #154 Any dispositive motion must be filed on or before May 18, 2018.(SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 5/4/2018. Plaintiff has filed a motion to substitute parties. #150 . Plaintiff notes Defendant Dr. Saleh Obaisi is now deceased and a suggestion of death was filed on December 29, 2017. #145 . Ghaliah Obaisi has been named as the executor of the doctors estate. Therefore, Plaintiffs motion to substitute the Administrator of the Estate, Ghaaliah Obaisi, as Defendant for Plaintiffs claims against Dr. Saleh Obaisi is granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25. #150 (RK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. Responses due by 6/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit D)(Rupcich, Joseph) Modified on 6/5/2018 to modify response deadline pursuant to Text Order 6/5/2018 (SAG, ilcd). Modified on 6/14/2018 to modify response deadline pursuant to Text Order 6/14/2018 (SAG, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 154 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Marcus Hardy, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. Responses due by 5/18/2018 (Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 153 ANSWER to #94 Amended Complaint by Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Medical Technician Bobby, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams.(Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dfts Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Malkowski, McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed and Tarry Williams' answer is due by 5/11/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/4/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Instanter by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Marcus Hardy, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Medical Technician Bobby, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. Responses due by 5/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Second Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses)(Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 151 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Malkowski, McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. Responses due by 4/20/2018 (Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION to Substitute Party, Saleh Obaisi to be replaced by Ghaliah Obaisi, by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 3/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/8/2018. Defendants unopposed motion to extend the dispositive motion deadline to April 6, 2018, is granted. #149 . (SAG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Marcus Hardy, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, McGarvey, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. Responses due by 3/20/2018 (Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #148 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ddl extended to 2/28/2018 and Dispositive Motion ddl extended to 3/7/2018. The Final Pretrial and trial remain as previously set. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/1/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 2/14/2018 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel for Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Joseph N Rupcich on behalf of Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Subpoena (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 145 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Saleh Obaisi by Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE of Subpoena (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley granting #143 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ddl extended to 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motions ddl extended to 2/28/2018. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/28/2018 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 7/30/2018 at 9:00 AM. Both hearings to be held in Courtroom A in Peoria before Chief Judge James E. Shadid. This is the final extension of time granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Entered on 11/20/17. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 143 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 12/1/2017 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Subpoena (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erik Henning Johnson on behalf of Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Griffin, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Malkowski, Naveen Nagpal, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams, McGarvey (Johnson, Erik) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Emma Steimel on behalf of Becky Buczkowski, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Kim Kelley, Guy Pierce (Steimel, Emma) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Emma Steimel on behalf of Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Dominic M Griffin, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams, Naveen Nagpal (Steimel, Emma) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 10, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph N Rupcich on behalf of Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams (Rupcich, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/17/2017. (SL, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: GRANTING #136 the Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for a Protective Order. The Clerk is directed to enter the Order contained in [136-1] the Plaintiff's Proposed Order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 07/14/17. (RT, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 136 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 7/27/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via phone with Attys T. Thompson, J. Lutzke, and D. Bitner for Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2017. After hearing argument, #133 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Additional Depositions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated on the record. Court grants Plaintiff leave to re-file Motion, if necessary, after written discovery is conducted and conferral with opposing counsel occurs. (Tape #PR-C: 3:23 PM.) (SL, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Motion Hearing in re #133 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Take In Excess of Ten Depositions. Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 6/22/2017 at 3:00 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/7/17. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Take In Excess of Ten Depositions filed by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Major Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lutzke, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Take In Excess of Ten Depositions filed by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. (Bitner, Douglass) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Take In Excess of Ten Depositions by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 6/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of April 14, 2017)(Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery extended to 6/30/17. All other deadlines and hearings remain as previously set in the 3/21/17 text order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/15/17. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 5/26/2017 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #131 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery to be completed by 5/15/17. All Discovery due by 11/17/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/26/2018 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial reset for 6/4/2018 at 9:00 AM. Both hearings in Courtroom A in Peoria before Chief Judge James E. Shadid. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/21/17. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Agreed) by Plaintiff Terence Taylor. Responses due by 4/3/2017 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Terence Taylor on 02/03/2017 (Bitner, Douglass) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
January 12, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Subpoena (Bitner, Douglass) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan #127. Discovery due by 8/31/17. Motions due by 10/6/17. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/18 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/12/18 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom A in Peoria before Chief Judge Shadid. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. If a dispute arises between the parties on any discovery issue, they are directed to promptly confer and, if said conference does not resolve the dispute, to contact the Court within 24 hours to schedule a hearing to resolve the dispute. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/20/16. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STANDING ORDER in civil cases. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/20/16. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
December 20, 2016 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added as referral judge. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 127 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Terence Taylor. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/6/2016. Pursuant to defendants' motion #126 Attorney Joel M Koppenhoefer is also terminated. (MB,ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/6/2016 granting #126 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael R Slovis terminated. Attorney Douglass Bitner added for defendants Foley, Garcia, Obaisi, Wexford and Latonya Williams. (MB, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 126 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Michael R. Slovis to be replaced by Douglass R. Bitner, by Defendants Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Bitner, Douglass) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Douglass R Bitner on behalf of Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latonya Williams (Bitner, Douglass) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 124 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:15-cv-05190. . [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
September 9, 2016 Filing 123 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois (Peoria Division) the electronic record. (pk,) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Filing 122 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (pk,) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Motion hearing held. Defendants' joint forum non conveniens motion to transfer venue or, alternatively, Rule 21 motion to sever pursuant to George V. Smith #109 is granted for the reasons in open court. Defendants' unopposed motion to join Wexford's reply in support of motion to transfer venue or, alternatively, Rule 21 motion to sever pursuant to George V. Smith #117 is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is transferred to the Central District of Illinois (Peoria Division). Mail ILND450. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/24/2016. Mailed notice. (pk,) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 120 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terence Taylor by Karl A. Leonard (Leonard, Karl) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 9, 2016 Filing 117 MOTION by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed to join reply in support of the motion to transfer/sever (UNOPPOSED) (Lutzke, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 116 REPLY by Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., LaTonya Williams to response in opposition to motion, #115 (Lu, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 115 RESPONSE by Terence Taylorin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Doretta O #109 (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held. Defendants, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Latanya Williams, P.A. Saleh Obaisi, M.D., Cynthia Garcia, and Meghan Foley motion to dismiss Count VI of Plaintiff's second amended complaint #105 is granted. Defendant, Wexford Health Sources, Inc.'s unopposed motion to dismiss VI and plaintiff's second amended complaint and plaintiff's Monell claims pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #106 is granted. Briefing schedule on motion to transfer #109 : responses by 8/1/2016; replies by 8/8/2016. Next status date set for 8/17/16 at 9:30 AM for ruling on motion to transfer case. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 22, 2016 Filing 113 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Doretta O'Brien, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Tarry Williams by Deborah J Baker (Baker, Deborah) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 112 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., LaTonya Williams (Gandhi, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM by Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Doretta O'Brien, Saleh Obaisi, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., LaTonya Williams, Tarry Williams in support of motion to transfer case, #109 (Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 109 MOTION by Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Calloway, Tralon Durrett, Krisi Eschleman, Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Mary Ellen Grennan, Dominic M Griffin, Kim Kelley, Michael Lemke, Michael Magana, Magarvie, Malkowski, Medical Technician Bobby, Doretta O'Brien, Saleh Obaisi, Guy Pierce, Royce Brown Reed, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., LaTonya Williams, Tarry Williams to transfer case or sever to Central District of Illinois (Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 108 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Meghan Foley by Michael R. Slovis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Slovis, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Filing 106 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (unopposed) (Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Filing 105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Count VI) (Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Filing 104 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Meghan Foley, Cyndi Garcia, Saleh Obaisi, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., LaTonya Williams(Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Meghan Foley by Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer (Koppenhoefer, Joel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Krisi Eschleman waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Mary Ellen Grennan waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Becky Buczkowski waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Becky Buczkowski, Krisi Eschleman, Mary Ellen Grennan, Kim Kelley, Guy Pierce by Jennifer Marie Lutzke (Lutzke, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Meghan Foley waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Guy Pierce waiver sent on 6/28/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terence Taylor. Kim Kelley waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 95 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Doretta O'Brien by Jennifer Marie Lutzke (Lutzke, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]
June 17, 2016 Filing 94 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Terence Taylor against All Defendants (Thompson, Tara) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Malkowski et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Technician Bobby
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Grennan
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Health Care Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Magarvie
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Hardy
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lemke
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Represented By: Terry S Lu
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Represented By: Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Melissa Y. Gandhi
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Calloway
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Buczkowski
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Pierce
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen Nagpal
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Helen Alicia Lozano
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Foley
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Represented By: Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Eschleman
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Magana
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latanya Williams
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Represented By: Terry S Lu
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Represented By: Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Melissa Y. Gandhi
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Illinois Department of Corrections Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tralon Durrett
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Helen Alicia Lozano
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic M Griffin
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Helen Alicia Lozano
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Garcia
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Represented By: Terry S Lu
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Represented By: Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Melissa Y. Gandhi
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarry Williams
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny McGarvey
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Helen Alicia Lozano
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghaliah Obaisi
Represented By: Terry S Lu
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Randy Malkowski
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Helen Alicia Lozano
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kelly
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Brown-Reed
Represented By: Emma Steimel
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Morris
Represented By: Erik Henning Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Phillip Waleed Rehani
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Emma Dorothy Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doretta O'Brien
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lutzke
Represented By: Stephanie A Kevil
Represented By: Deborah J Baker
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Kevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Saleh Obaisi
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Represented By: Terry S Lu
Represented By: Joseph Nickolas Rupcich
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Represented By: Joel Matthew Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Melissa Y. Gandhi
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Taylor
Represented By: Karl A. Leonard
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Roger H. Stein
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?