Downs v. Village of Dolton et al
Plaintiff: Trina L. Downs
Defendant: Riley Rogers, Janice Johnson, Elizabeth Scott, Sonye London and Village of Dolton
Case Number: 1:2019cv07266
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order #10 dated 12/17/19 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to defendant Janice Johnson, Sonye London, Riley Rogers, Elizabeth Scott, Village of Dolton via email. (kp, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Trina L. Downs (Exhibits). (kp, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion hearing held on 12/17/2019. Counsel for defendants accepted service of the complaint on the record. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #5 is taken under advisement. The Court directs the parties to continue negotiations to resolve this dispute by 12/23/2019. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/14/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 1/16/2020 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Trina L. Downs for presentment of application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 , motion for attorney representation #5 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (kp, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janice Johnson, Sonye London, Riley Rogers, Elizabeth Scott, Village of Dolton by John B. Murphey (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murphey, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Trina L. Downs for attorney representation. (kp, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Trina L. Downs for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (kp, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Trina L. Downs. (kp, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Trina L. Downs (Exhibits). (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. Village of Dolton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina L. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Rogers
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Johnson
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Scott
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonye London
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Dolton
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?