Bahr et al v. State Collection Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Bahr and Christine Bahr
Defendant: State Collection Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07267
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by State Collection Service, Inc.(Newman, Patrick)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. by Patrick Daniel Newman (Newman, Patrick)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 1/23/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 1/20/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Bahr, Matthew Bahr as to State Collection Service, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Thompson, Bryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
November 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (acm, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christine Bahr, Matthew Bahr by Stacy Michelle Bardo (Bardo, Stacy)
November 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christine Bahr, Matthew Bahr by Robert W. Harrer (Harrer, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christine Bahr, Matthew Bahr by Bryan Paul Thompson (Thompson, Bryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Bahr, Matthew Bahr; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16405392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahr et al v. State Collection Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bahr
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: Stacy Michelle Bardo
Represented By: Robert W. Harrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bahr
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: Stacy Michelle Bardo
Represented By: Robert W. Harrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Service, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?