Goldstein v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Goldstein
Defendant: CHASE BANK, USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07268
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 Chase's FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Michelau, Amy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Amy Michelau for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/10/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Michelau, Amy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. for extension of time to file answer (Michelau, Amy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. by Amy Michelau (Michelau, Amy)
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chase Bank USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions Inc. (txl, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 3/4/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 2/28/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
November 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Teresa Goldstein by Alexander John Mikulaschek (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Teresa Goldstein; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16405414. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1099 C, #2 Exhibit Credit Report, #3 Exhibit Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit Credit Report)(Mikulaschek, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Goldstein
Represented By: Alexander John Mikulaschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK, USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Michelau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?