ClearOne, Inc. v. Shure Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: ClearOne, Inc.
Defendant: Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc. and Shure Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv07285
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The agreed motion to stay #28 is granted. This case is stayed until a decision (including through potential objections) is issued in 19-cv-1343 (D. Del.) on the first-to-file issue. Status hearing of 03/10/2020 remains in place for now. The parties shall file a concise status report on the Delaware case on 03/05/2020 (or within three business days of a decision in that case). Mailed notice (mw, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 30 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Pursuant to ECF 27 by ClearOne, Inc. (MISHRA, SOURABH)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Elliot Charles Cook for presentment of motion to stay #28 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/27/2020 at 10:00 AM. (Cook, Elliot)
January 13, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION by Defendants Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc., Shure Incorporated to stay , Joint Motion To Stay Pending Resolution Of "First-To-File" Issue By District Of Delaware Court (Cook, Elliot)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Christina Rayburn appeared by telephone for ClearOne; counsel on both sides appeared in court. If Defendant files a motion to dismiss, then counsel shall notice it for presentment. By 01/15/2020, counsel shall file a joint status report on how the litigation should proceed. Status hearing set for 03/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
December 15, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to the order entered in 17-cv-3078, R. 686, the status hearing of 12/16/2019 is reset for 12/19/2019 at 02:15 PM.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
December 5, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing previously set for 1/24/20 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing of 12/05/2019 is reset to 12/16/2019 at 10:15 AM.Emailed notice (eec)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/2019.(lma, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 12/05/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before the Hon. Edmond E. Chang. Mailed notice (mw, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motions to appear pro hac vice by Elliot Cook #18 , Joseph Schaffner #19 and Alexander Boyer #20 are granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16481638. (Boyer, Alexander)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16476968. (Schaffner, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16476830. (Cook, Elliot)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time until 1/13/20 to answer #15 is granted. The status hearing set for 1/8/20 is reset to 1/24/20 at 2:00 p.m.The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Vladimir I Arezina for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Arezina, Vladimir)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc., Shure Incorporated for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Arezina, Vladimir)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc., Shure Incorporated by Vladimir I Arezina (Arezina, Vladimir)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ClearOne, Inc. as to Shure Incorporated on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Dixon, Douglas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ClearOne, Inc. as to Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc. on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Dixon, Douglas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motions to appear pro hac vice by Christina Rayburn #8 , Douglas Dixon #9 and Sourabh Mishra #10 are granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16421322. (MISHRA, SOURABH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16421318. (Dixon, Douglas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16421305. (Rayburn, Christina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/8/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc., and Shure Incorporated. (acm, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (lma, )
November 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by ClearOne, Inc. of Claim Involving Patents Under Local Rule 3.4 (Leach, Garret)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ClearOne, Inc. (Leach, Garret)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ClearOne, Inc. by Garret A. Leach (Leach, Garret)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leach, Garret)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Non-Infringement filed by ClearOne, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16407257. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Leach, Garret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ClearOne, Inc. v. Shure Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ClearOne, Inc.
Represented By: Garret A. Leach
Represented By: SOURABH MISHRA
Represented By: Christina Von der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Douglas J. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Schaffner
Represented By: Alexander Michael Boyer
Represented By: Vladimir I Arezina
Represented By: Elliot Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shure Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Michael Schaffner
Represented By: Alexander Michael Boyer
Represented By: Vladimir I Arezina
Represented By: Elliot Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?