Sevald v. The National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Plaintiff: Steven S. Sevald
Defendant: Mid-American Athletic Conference, Inc., The National Collegiate Athletic Association and The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07354
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02819 (bg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on November 6, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 24. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by STEVEN S. SEVALD. THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/26/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff STEVEN S. SEVALD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/23/2019. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5536658), filed by Plaintiff STEVEN S. SEVALD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MID-AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE, INC., THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC., THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by STEVEN S. SEVALD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5518474) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevald v. The National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-American Athletic Conference, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Mark Steven Mester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Sevald
Represented By: Vincent P. Circelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?