Krzyzanowski v Brunch Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Krzyzanowski
Defendant: Ted Zatos, Brunch Ltd, BNL St. Charles Corporation and Andrew Zatos
Case Number: 1:2019cv07427
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court's protective order entered on December 17, 2019 #18 was entered in error and is hereby vacated. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 1/9/2020. The motion presentment date of 12/18/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by BNL St. Charles Corporation (Ekstrom, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Brunch Ltd (Ekstrom, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Brian Dean Ekstrom for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ekstrom, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead joint unopposed (Attachments: #1 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates, #2 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates)(Ekstrom, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd by Brian Dean Ekstrom (Ekstrom, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd by John C. O'Connor (O'Connor, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Krzyzanowski as to BNL St. Charles Corporation on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Brunch Ltd on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Stephan, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos by Konstantinos T. Sparagis (Sparagis, Konstantinos)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Krzyzanowski as to Andrew Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ted Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Stephan, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Megan Shannon (Shannon, Megan)
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos (Lam, Tina)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
November 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephan, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Krzyzanowski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16425267. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stephan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krzyzanowski v Brunch Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Zatos
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunch Ltd
Represented By: Brian Dean Ekstrom
Represented By: John C. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNL St. Charles Corporation
Represented By: Brian Dean Ekstrom
Represented By: John C. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Zatos
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Krzyzanowski
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Megan Shannon
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?