Aon plc et al v. Infinite Equity, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aon Group, Inc. and Aon plc
Defendant: Jon Burg, Elizabeth Stoudt, Terry Adamson, Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans and Infinite Equity, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07504
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The motion hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for TRO #23 and motion for expedited discovery #26 is reset to 12:30 p.m. on 1/13/2020. (TIME CHANGE ONLY). (rao, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC by Jessica F. Pizzutelli (Pizzutelli, Jessica)
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Motion hearing held on 1/7/2020. Plaintiffs' motion for TRO #23 and motion for expedited discovery #26 are entered and continued to 1/13/2020 at 1:30 p.m. The parties should notify the court by 1/10/2020 if they have been able to resolve any of the issues in this lawsuit. (rao, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Jon Burg, Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans, Infinite Equity, Inc., Elizabeth Stoudtin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC for discovery to expedite Discovery #26 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC for temporary restraining order #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Cory)
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Terry Adamson to MOTION by Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC for discovery to expedite Discovery #26 (Vanko, Kenneth)
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by James M. Witz for presentment of motion for discovery #26 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Witz, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC for discovery to expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Witz, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by James M. Witz for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #23 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Witz, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Pizzutelli, #2 Declaration of Daniel Kapinos)(Witz, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon PLC for temporary restraining order (Witz, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans, Elizabeth Stoudt by Maxwell Anthony Kling (Kling, Maxwell)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans, Elizabeth Stoudt by Cory D Anderson (Anderson, Cory)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans, Elizabeth Stoudt by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Aon PLC, Aon Group, Inc.. Tyler Evans waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Henry, Orly)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Aon PLC, Aon Group, Inc.. Elizabeth Stoudt waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Henry, Orly)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Aon PLC, Aon Group, Inc.. Daniel Coleman waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Henry, Orly)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Jessica F. Pizzutelli's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #15 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16529162. (Pizzutelli, Jessica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Terry Adamson by Kenneth J. Vanko (Vanko, Kenneth)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Aon PLC, Aon Group, Inc. as to Terry Adamson waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Henry, Orly) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendants Infinite Equity, Inc. and Jon Burg's motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. The motion hearing set for 12/10/2019 is stricken. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/14/2020. Status hearing set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jon Burg, Infinite Equity, Inc. by Cory D Anderson (Anderson, Cory)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Maxwell Anthony Kling for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kling, Maxwell)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Jon Burg, Infinite Equity, Inc. for extension of time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' complaint (Kling, Maxwell)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jon Burg, Infinite Equity, Inc. by Maxwell Anthony Kling (Kling, Maxwell)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jon Burg, Infinite Equity, Inc. by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew)
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Infinite Equity, Inc. (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Terry Adamson, Jon Burg, Daniel Coleman, Tyler Evans, Elizabeth Stoudt (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon plc by Orly Michal Henry (Henry, Orly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon plc by Matthew J Ruza (Ruza, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs Corporate Disclosure Statement (Witz, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aon Group, Inc., Aon plc by James M. Witz (Witz, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Witz, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Aon plc, Aon Group, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16436985. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F-5)(Witz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aon plc et al v. Infinite Equity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Burg
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Represented By: Maxwell Anthony Kling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Stoudt
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Represented By: Maxwell Anthony Kling
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Adamson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Vanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Coleman
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Represented By: Maxwell Anthony Kling
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Evans
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Represented By: Maxwell Anthony Kling
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinite Equity, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Represented By: Maxwell Anthony Kling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aon Group, Inc.
Represented By: Orly Michal Henry
Represented By: James M. Witz
Represented By: Matthew J Ruza
Represented By: Jessica F. Pizzutelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aon plc
Represented By: Orly Michal Henry
Represented By: James M. Witz
Represented By: Matthew J Ruza
Represented By: Jessica F. Pizzutelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?