Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Dinatale Construction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund and Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity
Defendant: Ninetta Inc., Carmela Marsico, Amatore Dinatale and Dinatale Construction Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07529
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by David R. Herzog for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herzog, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by David R. Herzog for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/15/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Herzog, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Carmela Marsico in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Herzog, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Carmela Marsico (Herzog, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Amatore Dinatale, Dinatale Construction Inc., Ninetta Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herzog, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amatore Dinatale, Dinatale Construction Inc., Carmela Marsico, Ninetta Inc. by David R. Herzog (Herzog, David)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus. Carmela Marsico waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Liska, G)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus. Dinatale Construction Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Liska, G)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus. Amatore Dinatale waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Liska, G)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus. Ninetta Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Liska, G)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 1/17/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. If both parties have appearances on file, the parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. Otherwise, the parties are to file a joint status report 3 business days, or as soon possible, prior to the parties' first appearance before the Court. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Amatore Dinatale, Dinatale Construction Inc., Carmela Marsico, Ninetta Inc. (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus by Sara Stewart Schumann (Schumann, Sara)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus by Amy Nicole Carollo (Carollo, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus by Katherine C.V. Mosenson (Mosenson, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus by Patrick T. Wallace (Wallace, Patrick)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus by G Ryan Liska (Liska, G)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Liska, G)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, Laborers' Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16439910. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Liska, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Dinatale Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wenskus
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninetta Inc.
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmela Marsico
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amatore Dinatale
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinatale Construction Inc.
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?