Masontops, Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Masontops, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Soligt, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07543
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time until 3/3/20 to answer #18 is granted. The status hearing set for 1/9/20 is reset to 3/10/20 at 9:00 a.m. Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice, each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masontops, Inc. as to Soligt, Inc. on 1/3/2020. (Schodde, Gregory)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Clements Schodde for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/9/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schodde, Gregory)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Masontops, Inc. for extension of time for Defendant Soligt, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and the Joint Initial Status Report (Motion Unopposed) (Schodde, Gregory)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Masontops, Inc. without prejudice as to Amazon.com, Inc. (Schodde, Gregory)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. by Kingshuk K Roy (Roy, Kingshuk)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time until January 6, 2020 to respond to the complaint #13 is granted. No appearance is required on the motionMailed notice (ca, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Clements Schodde for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schodde, Gregory)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Masontops, Inc. for extension of time for Defendant Amazon to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) (Schodde, Gregory)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masontops, Inc. as to Amazon.Com, Inc. on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Schodde, Gregory)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/9/20 at 9:15 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 19 CV 7543, Masontops, Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al., pending before the Hon. Ronald A Guzman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating; therefore It is hereby ordered that 19 CV 7543, Masontops, Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al., is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/2019. (ph, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Clerk of Court is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice (mw, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, )
November 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Soligt, Inc. (Lam, Tina)
November 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Masontops, Inc. by Dunstan H. Barnes (Barnes, Dunstan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Masontops, Inc. by Christopher V. Carani (Carani, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Masontops, Inc. (Schodde, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Masontops, Inc. re complaint #1 (Schodde, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Masontops, Inc. by Gregory Clements Schodde (Schodde, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schodde, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Masontops, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16441773. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schodde, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masontops, Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masontops, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Clements Schodde
Represented By: Christopher V. Carani
Represented By: Dunstan H. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Kingshuk K Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soligt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?