The Courtland Company, Inc. et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: The Courtland Company, Inc.
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation and Dow Chemical Company, Inc.
Petitioner: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07545
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 12/16/2019 and continued to 1/15/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the parties request, the status hearing set for 12/17/2019 is vacated and reset to 12/16/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets this matter for a status hearing on 12/17/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Courtland Company, Inc. by Thomas Anthony Smith (Smith, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ph, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Jacobs Engineering Group Inc. by Michael John Pollock (Pollock, Michael)
November 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Jacobs Engineering Group Inc. by W. Matthew Bryant (Bryant, W. Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bryant, W. Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Jacobs Engineering Group Inc. Motion to Quash Subpoenas Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-16442119. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Subpoenas, #2 Memorandum)(Bryant, W. Matthew) Modified on 11/18/2019 (ph, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Courtland Company, Inc. et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Courtland Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.
Represented By: W. Matthew Bryant
Represented By: Michael John Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?