Garland v. Exelon Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Garland
Defendant: Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Jessica Mangum-Allen, Exelon Corp., Craig Weber, Commonwealth Edison Co., Commonwealth Edison Company and Exelon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv07560
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by James P. Looby for presentment of motion to supplement,, #12 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/16/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Looby, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Commonwealth Edison Company, Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Exelon Corporation, Jessica Mangum-Allen, Craig Weber to supplement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (and its Exhibits 1-A, 1-B, and 1-C), #2 Exhibit 2 (and its Exhibits 2-A, 2-B, and 2-C), #3 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part A, #4 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part B, #5 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part C, #6 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part D, #7 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part E, #8 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part F, #9 Exhibit 3 (Illinois State Court File), Part G)(Looby, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Garland for leave to remand (Exhibits) (bg, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Plaintiff's oral request for a one-day extension of time to file his motion to remand is granted. Plaintiff's motion for remand is due 12/17/2019. Defendants' response will be due by 1/17/2020. Plaintiff's reply brief will be due by 1/31/2020. On the Court's own motion the status hearing set for 2/4/2020 is stricken and reset to 2/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (rao, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Motion hearing and status hearing held on 12/3/2019. Defendants' motion for a status conference and an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint #7 is granted. The responsive pleading deadline is stayed until the Court rules on the motion to remand. Plaintiff's motion to remand is due 12/16/2019. Defendants' response is due by 1/16/2020. Plaintiff's reply brief is due by 1/30/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 2/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (rao, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by James P. Looby for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/3/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Looby, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Commonwealth Edison Company, Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Exelon Corporation, Jessica Mangum-Allen, Craig Weber for extension of time to file answer and for a status conference (Looby, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation (Looby, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Commonwealth Edison Company, Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Exelon Corporation, Jessica Mangum-Allen, Craig Weber by James P. Looby (Looby, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
November 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Commonwealth Edison Co., Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Exelon Corp., Jessica Mangum-Allen, Craig Weber by Stephanie L. Sweitzer (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 L 011192) filed by Rosemary Colella-Seavey, Commonwealth Edison Co., Yvette Daniels, Kathy Egan, Exelon Corp., Jessica Mangum-Allen, Craig Weber Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16444984. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sweitzer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garland v. Exelon Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Daniels
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Egan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Colella-Seavey
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Mangum-Allen
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corp.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Weber
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Co.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: James P. Looby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?