Grama et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Anatoli Grama and Ebony Griffin
Defendant: District Director Mirash Dedvukaj, Attorney General William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Acting Director Michael Klinger, Chad F. Wolf, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kathy A Baran and Michael Klinger
Case Number: 1:2019cv07572
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kathy A Baran, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Michael Klinger, Chad F. Wolf (Treacy, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kathy A Baran, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Michael Klinger, Chad F. Wolf (Oswald, Craig)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to All Defendants (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to William P. Barr served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to Michael Klinger served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to Mirash Dedvukaj served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to Kathy A Baran served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin as to Chad F. Wolf served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Vinikoor, Robert)
December 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Kathy A Baran, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Michael Klinger, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (axc, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
November 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin by Robert Daniel Vinikoor (Vinikoor, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anatoli Grama, Ebony Griffin; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16446401. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vinikoor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grama et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Mirash Dedvukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Michael Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A Baran
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klinger
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatoli Grama
Represented By: Robert Daniel Vinikoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Griffin
Represented By: Robert Daniel Vinikoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?