Crawford v. Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Dionte Crawford
Defendant: Tom Dart and Parker Sheriff
Case Number: 1:2019cv07584
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is taken under consideration. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from December 1, 2019, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff was incarcerated at more than one facility during that time, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by February 3, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case progress to a point where counsel becomes necessary. See Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019) (suggesting that motion for attorney representation is premature if filed "so early in the case that it was impossible to tell whether [the plaintiff] could represent himself adequately"). The Court defers review of Plaintiff's complaint until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/13/2020. Mailed notice(smm, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, )
November 25, 2019 MAILED Copy of Order dated 11/25/19, a blank application to proceed informa pauperis to Plaintiff Dionte Crawford. (smm, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00; or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the statement section of this order. Failure to comply with this order by December 23, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation until after his fee status has been resolved. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/25/2019. Mailed notice (smm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for attorney representation. (smm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Dionte Crawford; (Attachments) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked). (Envelope not postmarked).(smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionte Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?