Davalos v. Focial Point, LLC
Plaintiff: Heather Davalos
Defendant: FOCIAL POINT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07617
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #4 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 20, 2020. Mailed notice (ewf,)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Danielle M. Kays for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kays, Danielle)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Richard Patrick McArdle (McArdle, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant Focial Point, LLC for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kays, Danielle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Danielle M. Kays (Kays, Danielle)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Davalos as to Focial Point, LLC on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Clark, Denise)
November 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant FOCIAL POINT, LLC (txl, )
November 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heather Davalos; Yes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16451961. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davalos v. Focial Point, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Davalos
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOCIAL POINT, LLC
Represented By: Danielle M. Kays
Represented By: Richard Patrick McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?