Stericycle, Inc. v. Melo
Plaintiff: Stericycle, Inc.
Defendant: Fernando Melo
Case Number: 1:2019cv07650
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Stericycle, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Fernando Melo to stay #11 [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Federal Abstention] (Garvey, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 12/19/2019. Defendant's motion for stay of MIDPP #12 is granted and all responsive pleadings are stayed pending ruling on motion for abstention. Briefing schedule on Defendant's motion for federal abstention #11 : Plaintiff's response is due by 1/16/2020; Defendant's reply is due by 1/30/2020. Next status date set for 4/30/2020 at 1:30 PM for ruling on motion for abstention. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by James John Hess, Jr for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #12 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/19/2019 at 01:45 PM. (Hess, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by David S. Allen for presentment of motion to stay, #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/19/2019 at 01:45 PM. (Allen, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Fernando Melo. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hess, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Fernando Melo to stay (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Supplement, #15 Notice of Filing)(Allen, David)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fernando Melo by James John Hess, Jr (Hess, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fernando Melo by David S. Allen (Allen, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/22/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/15/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stericycle, Inc. as to Fernando Melo on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Weinstein, Alex)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
November 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fernando Melo (txl, )
November 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stericycle, Inc. (Weinstein, Alex)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stericycle, Inc. by James Vincent Garvey (Garvey, James)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stericycle, Inc. by Alex Chad Weinstein (Weinstein, Alex)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Weinstein, Alex)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stericycle, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16456952. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Weinstein, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stericycle, Inc. v. Melo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stericycle, Inc.
Represented By: James Vincent Garvey
Represented By: Alex Chad Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Melo
Represented By: David S. Allen
Represented By: James John Hess, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?