Fawley v. Health Care Service Corporation
Plaintiff: James Fawley
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation, d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois and Health Care Service Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv07658
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by James Fawley (Green, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion by Lisa S. Kantor for leave to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/16/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James Fawley. Health Care Service Corporation waiver sent on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Casciari, Marie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16495123. (Kantor, Lisa)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/22/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/15/2020. Motion by James Fawley for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/3/2019. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Meredith Ann Shippee (Shippee, Meredith)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Martin J. Bishop (Bishop, Martin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Rebecca R. Hanson (Hanson, Rebecca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16481113. (Green, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
November 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casciari, Marie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James Fawley by Mark D. DeBofsky (DeBofsky, Mark)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James Fawley by Marie E. Casciari (Casciari, Marie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Fawley; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16458651.(Casciari, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fawley v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation, d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Represented By: Meredith Ann Shippee
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fawley
Represented By: Mark D. DeBofsky
Represented By: Marie E. Casciari
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Green
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?