Norwood v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Randy Norwood
Defendant: S. Klimek, Cook County, Illinois, C. Ackerman, Thomas J. Dart, Patterson-Dean, F. Ruiz and K. Shankey
Case Number: 1:2019cv07752
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time [R. 10] is granted. The Court will consider reinstatement if Plaintiff either files an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pays the statutory filing fee, as previously directed, by February 10, 2020. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/13/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Randy Norwood for time extension (Envelope postmarked 1/7/2020) (las, )
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The case is dismissed in view of Plaintiff's failure either to submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the statutory filing fee, as directed. Civil case closed. Dismissal is without prejudice to re-filing suit. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation [R. 3] is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/13/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 3, 2019 MAILED copy of order #8 and blank ifp application to plaintiff (las, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is granted until January 6, 2020, either to file an in forma pauperis application on the enclosed form with the information required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the full $400 filing fee. The Court directs the Clerk to send Plaintiff an IFP application along with a copy of this order. Failure of Plaintiff to comply by the deadline will result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/3/2019. Mailed notice(las, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding received complaint #1 (las, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Randy Norwood (Envelope postmarked 11/21/2019) (las, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Randy Norwood dated 11/13/2019 (Envelope postmarked 11/21/2019). (las, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Randy Norwood for attorney representation (Attachment) (las, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Randy Norwood (Attachments) (Attachments: #1 (Envelope postmarked 11/13/2019))(las, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Klimek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson-Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Shankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?